EP3335781 - METHOD TO PRODUCE CATALYSTS AND CATALYSTS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YARA International ASA P.O. Box 343 Skøyen 0213 Oslo / NO | [2018/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALLER, David Hovet Ring 53 N-3931 Porsgrunn / NO | 02 /
BRACKENBURY, David, M. Kikutvegen 20 N-3941 Porsgrunn / NO | [2018/25] | Representative(s) | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [2018/25] | Application number, filing date | 17202281.6 | 04.07.2008 | [2018/25] | Priority number, date | NO20070003460 | 04.07.2007 Original published format: NO 20073460 | [2018/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3335781 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/56, B01D53/94, B01J2/22, B01J23/75, B01J35/04, B01J37/00, B29C45/00, C04B38/00, B01D46/24 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
B01J23/83 (EP,US);
B01J20/3007 (EP,US);
B01J35/19 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
B01J37/0009 (EP,US);
B01J37/0018 (EP,US);
B01J37/0036 (EP,US);
B01J37/0045 (EP,US);
B01J37/088 (EP,US);
B28B1/24 (EP,US);
B28B7/18 (EP,US);
C04B35/50 (EP,US);
C04B35/62813 (EP,US);
C04B35/62886 (EP,US);
C04B35/632 (EP,US);
B01J23/005 (EP,US);
B01J23/75 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3229 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3275 (EP,US);
C04B2235/449 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KATALYSATOREN UND ENTSPRECHENDE KATALYSATOREN | [2018/25] | English: | METHOD TO PRODUCE CATALYSTS AND CATALYSTS THEREOF | [2018/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CATALYSEURS ET CATALYSEURS ASSOCIÉS | [2018/25] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/25] | 17.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/25] | 31.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/25] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08779104.2 / EP2164611 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IDA]US4743578 (DAVIDSON PETER J [GB]) [ID] 7-9 * abstract * * figure - * [A] 1-6; | [A]EP0294305 (HOWMET CORP [US]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [A]EP0377960 (CORNING INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0459396 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH06304481 (MATSUMOTO KOKAN KK) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [IA]JPH1182005 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [I] 7-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0015] - [0019] - [0026] - [0030] - [0034] * * figure - * * claim - * [A] 1-6; | [A]WO9932277 (CORNING INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5935896 (DUPUIS JACQUES [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US6299958 (ST JULIEN DELL J [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 1, lines 42-58 * * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 18 * * column 9, line 33 - column 10, line 48 * * figure - *; | [A]US6328915 (SANDER MATTHEW T [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [IA]WO2006009453 (YARA INT ASA [NO], et al) [I] 7-9 * the whole document * * page 3, lines 15-20 * * page 4, line 32 - page 6, line 5 * * figure - * [A] 1-6; | [A]GB2432713 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [AP]US2007238256 (FISCHER MICHAEL [US], et al) [AP] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0006] , [0024] , [0025]; figures 2B,4,7B *; | [AP]WO2007126710 (CORNING INC [US], et al) [AP] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [AP]US2007281127 (BACKHAUS-RICOULT MONIKA [US], et al) [AP] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1961930 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [E] 7-9 * abstract * * figures 2B,4,7 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0022] , [0023] , [0028] , [0035] , [0036] , [0074] - [0078] * |