EP3489639 - COOKING ASSISTANCE DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2019/22] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STARMANS, Franciscus Jozef Marie c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
WALDNER, Roland c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/22] | Application number, filing date | 17203242.7 | 23.11.2017 | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3489639 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01G19/56, A47J43/07 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
G01G19/56 (EP,US);
A47J27/62 (US);
A47J36/321 (US);
A47J43/04 (US);
G01G19/24 (US);
G01G19/414 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOCHASSISTENZVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2019/22] | English: | COOKING ASSISTANCE DEVICE AND METHOD | [2019/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'ASSISTANCE À LA CUISSON | [2019/22] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/19] | 20.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2016048720 (PALMER PAUL [GB], et al) [Y] 2,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] ** paragraph [0032] *; | [XYI]US2017035249 (DICKSON JR THOMAS D [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8-12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034] * [Y] 2,13 [I] 7 |