EP3331200 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR BUFFERING REPORTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON LICENSING 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | [2018/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUMANN, Christoph Technicolor R & D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs ZAC des Champs Blancs CS 176 16 35576 Cesson Sévigné / FR | 02 /
LE GUYADEC, Pascal Technicolor R & D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs ZAC des Champs Blancs CS 176 16 35576 Cesson Sévigné / FR | [2018/23] | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/23] | Ståhl, Björn Niclas TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 17203419.1 | 23.11.2017 | [2018/23] | Priority number, date | EP20160306594 | 01.12.2016 Original published format: EP 16306594 | [2018/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3331200 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26, H04L12/861, H04L12/879, H04L12/883 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
H04L43/06 (EP,US);
H04L67/5682 (US);
G06F3/061 (US);
G06F3/0656 (US);
G06F3/067 (US);
H04L43/00 (US);
H04L43/0811 (EP,US);
H04L49/90 (EP,US);
H04L49/9005 (EP,US);
H04L49/901 (EP,US);
H04L49/9021 (EP,US);
H04L49/9026 (EP,US);
H04L49/9036 (EP,US);
H04L49/9042 (EP,US);
H04L49/9047 (EP,US);
H04L49/9052 (EP,US);
H04L49/9084 (EP,US);
H04L49/9089 (EP,US);
H04L49/9094 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR PUFFERUNGSBERICHTE | [2018/23] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR BUFFERING REPORTS | [2018/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN TAMPON DE RAPPORTS | [2018/23] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/24] | 22.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010167658 (HOFFMAN GEORGE E [US]) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0045]; figure 2;5A;5B * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0082] *; | [A]US2015148029 (HIRSCH LUCIAN [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0088] *; | [A] - EFRAIMIDIS P S ET AL, "Weighted random sampling with a reservoir", INFORMATION PROCESSING LETTERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 97, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.IPL.2005.11.003, ISSN 0020-0190, (20060316), pages 181 - 185, (20060316), XP028067913 [A] 6,12 * page 1, column 1, lines 5-9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ipl.2005.11.003 | by applicant | - VITTER, JEFFREY S., "Random Sampling with a Reservoir", ACM Transactions on Mathematical Software, (19850301), vol. 11, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1145/3147.3165, pages 37 - 57, XP058202892 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/3147.3165 |