EP3488952 - A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A TOOL HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seco Tools AB 737 82 Fagersta / SE | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frejd, Stefan Erik Dahlbergsgatan 5 614 30 Söderköping / SE | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Sandvik Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [2019/22] | Application number, filing date | 17203431.6 | 24.11.2017 | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3488952 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3488952 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/02, B23B51/06, B23C5/28, B22F3/04, B22F3/105, B22F3/14, B22F3/15, B22F3/22, B22F5/10, B22F7/06, B23P15/32, B23P15/34, B22F10/20, // B22F5/00 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
B22F5/10 (EP,KR,US);
B22F10/10 (KR);
B22F10/20 (EP,US);
B22F3/02 (EP);
B22F3/04 (EP,KR);
B22F3/14 (EP);
B22F3/15 (EP,KR);
B22F3/225 (EP,KR);
B22F5/00 (US);
B22F7/062 (EP,KR,US);
B23B51/06 (EP,US);
B23C5/28 (EP,US);
B23C5/285 (KR);
B23P15/32 (EP,KR,US);
B23P15/34 (EP,KR,US);
B33Y80/00 (US);
B22F2005/001 (EP,KR,US);
B22F2005/005 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2019/22] | B22F3/02, B23B51/06, B23C5/28, B22F3/04, B22F3/105, B22F3/14, B22F3/15, B22F3/22, B22F5/10, B22F7/06, B23P15/32, B23P15/34, // B22F5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] |
Former [2019/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES WERKZEUGKOPFES | [2019/22] | English: | A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A TOOL HEAD | [2019/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE TÊTE D'OUTIL | [2019/22] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 29.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 13.03.2024 | ES | 13.03.2024 | FI | 13.03.2024 | HR | 13.03.2024 | LT | 13.03.2024 | LV | 13.03.2024 | NL | 13.03.2024 | SE | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.06.2024 | RS | 13.06.2024 | GR | 14.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
SE | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 13.03.2024 | |
NO | 13.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPS62133006 (KUROKI KOGYOSHO KK); | [XDY]US2013223943 (GEY CHRISTOPH [DE], et al) | Examination | JPH04198404 |