EP3489003 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURE OF AN INFLATABLE PRODUCT WITH AN ATTACHABLE FOAM FINISH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NautiBuoy Marine Limited 1 Hunters Moon House Dartington Totnes, Devon TQ9 6EZ / GB | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUILDER, Clay 1 Hunters Moon House Dartington Totnes, Devon TQ9 6EZ / GB | 02 /
ANDERSON, Nina 1 Hunters Moon House Dartington Totnes, Devon TQ9 6EZ / GB | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Optimus Patents Limited Peak Hill House Steventon Basingstoke, Hampshire RG25 3AZ / GB | [2019/22] | Application number, filing date | 17203543.8 | 24.11.2017 | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3489003 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3489003 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B29D22/02, B29C65/48, // B63B7/08, B63C1/02, B29K105/04 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
B29C66/727 (EP,US);
B29C63/0017 (EP);
B29C63/02 (EP);
B29C63/48 (EP);
B29C65/48 (EP);
B29C65/5057 (EP);
B29C66/028 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/5326 (EP);
B29D22/02 (EP);
B29C2063/485 (EP);
B29C2793/009 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
B29K2105/04 (EP);
B29L2022/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/083 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] |
Former [2019/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 29.11.2019 | ME | 29.11.2019 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES AUFBLASBAREN PRODUKTES MIT EINER BEFESTIGBAREN SCHAUMSTOFFAUFLAGE | [2019/22] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURE OF AN INFLATABLE PRODUCT WITH AN ATTACHABLE FOAM FINISH | [2019/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PRODUIT GONFLABLE AYANT UNE FINITION DE MOUSSE ATTACHABLE | [2019/22] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 24.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.05.2020 | AT | 13.05.2020 | CY | 13.05.2020 | CZ | 13.05.2020 | DK | 13.05.2020 | FI | 13.05.2020 | LT | 13.05.2020 | LV | 13.05.2020 | MK | 13.05.2020 | MT | 13.05.2020 | PL | 13.05.2020 | RS | 13.05.2020 | SE | 13.05.2020 | SK | 13.05.2020 | SM | 13.05.2020 | BG | 13.08.2020 | NO | 13.08.2020 | IS | 13.09.2020 | PT | 14.09.2020 | IE | 24.11.2020 | LU | 24.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MT | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
IE | 24.11.2020 | ||
LU | 24.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
IE | 24.11.2020 | ||
LU | 24.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
LU | 24.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 13.05.2020 | |
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 13.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JP2000006284 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [Y] 2-14 * figure 3 * [A] 1; | [YA] - Nautibuoy Marine, "Specialists in multi-functional inflatable platforms Contents", (20160101), URL: https://www.moremarine.nl/moremarine.nl//pdf/Nautibuoy2016-brochure.pdf, (20180517), XP055476291 [Y] 2-14 * page 27; figure thrid row / fourth column * [A] 1 | [A] - Nautibuoy Marine, "Specialists in multi-functional inflatable platforms", (20160101), URL: http://www.nauticalventures.com/static/sitefiles/inflatables-fun/nautibuoy/Nautibuoy-Brochure.pdf, (20180517), XP055476287 [A] 1-14 * page 45; figure third row / second column * |