EP3489704 - LOCAL MRT COIL FOR A DENTAL MRI MEASURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sirona Dental Systems GmbH Fabrikstr. 31 64625 Bensheim / DE | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WUNDRAK, Stefan Kreuzstraße 6A 64625 Bensheim / DE | 02 /
ULRICI, Johannes Herdweg 85 64285 Darmstadt / DE | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | Özer, Alpdeniz, et al Sirona Dental Systems GmbH Corporate Legal Fabrikstraße 31 64625 Bensheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/22] | Sommer, Peter PRIO Patentanwälte Augustaanlage 22 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 17203588.3 | 24.11.2017 | [2019/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3489704 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/34, G01R33/3415 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
G01R33/34007 (EP);
G01R33/3415 (EP);
G01R33/34084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LOKALE MRT-SPULE FÜR EINE DENTALE MRT-MESSUNG | [2019/22] | English: | LOCAL MRT COIL FOR A DENTAL MRI MEASURING | [2019/22] | French: | BOBINE RMN LOCALE POUR UNE MESURE D'IRM DENTAIRE | [2019/22] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/21] | 02.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6029082 (SRINIVASAN RAVI [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-12 * column 4, line 58 - column 6, line 50 * * figures 2-4 * [I] 5,14,15; | [XI]DE10132594 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,11 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0017] * * figure 1 * [I] 7,9,10; | [XI]JP2017184889 (KIYOHARA OPTICS INC) [X] 1-4,6,8-12 * figure 3 * [I] 5,7,14,15; | [A]WO2012156866 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 * | [XI] - GRADL J ET AL, "Application of a Dedicated Surface Coil in Dental MRI Provides Superior Image Quality in Comparison with a Standard Coil", CLINICAL NEURORADIOLOGY, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN/HEIDELBERG, vol. 27, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S00062-016-0500-9, ISSN 1869-1439, (20160211), pages 371 - 378, (20160211), XP036308711 [X] 1-4,6,8-10,14,15 * Abschnitt "Materials and Methods" * * figures 1, 2 * [I] 5,7,11-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00062-016-0500-9 | [I] - M DÜRING ET AL, "A dedicated 4-channel RF receiving array for orthodontic examinations", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, ISMRM, 17TH SCIENTIFIC MEETING AND EXHIBITION, HONOLULU, HAWAII, USA, 18-24 APRIL 2009, (20090404), page 2967, XP040610199 [I] 1-15 * Abschnitt "Methods and Materials" * * figure 1 * | by applicant | DE102014220116 |