EP3489797 - CONTROLLING A BATTERY-OPERATED RANGE EXTENDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2019/22] | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gacanin, Haris Nokia Bell N.V. Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | 02 /
Atawia, Ramy Nokia Bell N.V. Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | IP HILLS NV Bellevue 5/501 9050 Gent-Ledeberg / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/22] | IP HILLS NV Hubert Frère-Orbanlaan 329 9000 Gent / BE | Application number, filing date | 17204190.7 | 28.11.2017 | [2019/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3489797 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/32, H04W64/00, H04W4/02 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W52/0258 (EP);
H04W64/00 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNG EINES BATTERIEBETRIEBENEN REICHWEITENERWEITERERS | [2019/22] | English: | CONTROLLING A BATTERY-OPERATED RANGE EXTENDER | [2019/22] | French: | COMMANDE D'UN PROLONGATEUR D'AUTONOMIE FONCTIONNANT SUR BATTERIE | [2019/22] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 13.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2015323974 (SHUSTER GARY STEPHEN [US], et al) [X] 1,8-11 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0035] , [0037] , [0039] , [0047] , [0049] , [0064] , [0078] , [0082] * [A] 2-7; | [A]GB2529857 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0090] , [0100] , [0115] , [0126] , [0174] , [0175] *; | [A]JP2012164325 (INTERBRO CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0033] - [0036] * | by applicant | - L. VU; Q. DO; K. NAHRSTEDT, "Jyotish: A novel framework for constructing predictive model of people movement from joint Wifi/Bluetooth trace", 2011 IEEE International Conference on Pervasive Computing and Communications (PerCom), (20110000), doi:doi:10.1109/PERCOM.2011.5767595, pages 54 - 62, XP031868415 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PERCOM.2011.5767595 |