EP3335618 - IMAGING MINI-SCOPE FOR ENDOSCOPE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cook Medical Technologies LLC 750 North Daniels Way Bloomington, IN 47404 / US | [2018/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUNCH, Kristin M. 4945 East Martin Drive Bloomington, IN Indiana 47408 / US | 02 /
MISKEWYCZ, Darian 2400 East Cedarwood Circle Bloomington, IN Indiana 47401 / US | 03 /
SMITH, Johnny P. 9899 North 350 West Worthington, IN Indiana 47471 / US | [2018/25] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/25] | Garratt, Peter Douglas, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 17205479.3 | 05.12.2017 | [2018/25] | Priority number, date | US201662433467P | 13.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662433467 P | [2018/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3335618 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3335618 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/05, A61B1/307, A61B1/005, // A61B1/06 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
A61B1/00078 (EP,US);
A61B1/00101 (EP,US);
A61B1/00135 (EP,US);
A61B1/00154 (EP,US);
A61B1/005 (US);
A61B1/0057 (EP,US);
A61B1/05 (EP,US);
A61B1/307 (EP,US);
A61B1/3132 (US);
H04N23/56 (US);
H04N25/00 (US);
A61B1/04 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] |
Former [2018/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDGEBENDES MINI-OSZILLOSKOP FÜR ENDOSKOPSYSTEM | [2018/25] | English: | IMAGING MINI-SCOPE FOR ENDOSCOPE SYSTEM | [2018/25] | French: | MINI-SCOPE D'IMAGERIE POUR SYSTÈME D'ENDOSCOPE | [2018/25] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 28.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.06.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4802461 (CHO GEORGE [US]); | [A]US4899732 (COHEN DONALD M [US]); | [XI]WO2013106444 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US], et al) |