EP3342265 - DEVICE FOR THE DISTRIBUTION OF BULK GOODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hugo Vogelsang Maschinenbau GmbH Holthöge 10-14 49632 Essen / DE | For all designated states Prometheus GmbH & Co. KG Löninger Straße 20-30 49624 Löningen-Bunnen / DE | [2018/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Block, Karl-Heinz Röpker Weg 4a 49624 Löningen / DE | 02 /
Krampe, Paul Kösliner Straße 17 49632 Essen / DE | 03 /
Hertwig, Martin Nelkenstraße 10 49632 Essen / DE | [2019/43] |
Former [2018/27] | 01 /
Block, Karl-Heinz Röpker Weg 4a 49624 Löningen / DE | ||
02 /
Krampe, Paul Kösliner Straße 17 49632 Essen/ Olbg. / DE | |||
03 /
Hertwig, Martin Nelkenstraße 10 49632 Essen / DE | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2018/27] | Application number, filing date | 17205500.6 | 18.08.2014 | [2018/27] | Priority number, date | DE20132007590U | 26.08.2013 Original published format: DE 202013007590 U | [2018/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3342265 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3342265 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A01C7/10, A01C23/00 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
A01C7/105 (EP,US);
A01C23/003 (US);
A01C23/007 (EP,US);
A01C23/008 (US);
B05B12/004 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/06] |
Former [2018/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUM VERTEILEN VON SCHÜTTGUT | [2018/27] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE DISTRIBUTION OF BULK GOODS | [2018/27] | French: | APPAREIL DE DISTRIBUTION DU PRODUIT EN VRAC | [2018/27] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/06] | 21.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14752333.6 / EP3038448 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.10.2019 | CY | 23.10.2019 | EE | 23.10.2019 | FI | 23.10.2019 | HR | 23.10.2019 | IT | 23.10.2019 | LT | 23.10.2019 | LV | 23.10.2019 | MC | 23.10.2019 | MK | 23.10.2019 | MT | 23.10.2019 | RO | 23.10.2019 | RS | 23.10.2019 | SI | 23.10.2019 | SK | 23.10.2019 | SM | 23.10.2019 | TR | 23.10.2019 | BG | 23.01.2020 | NO | 23.01.2020 | GR | 24.01.2020 | IS | 23.02.2020 | PT | 24.02.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
MT | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
TR | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 23.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0079018 (VOGELSANG HUGO FASS MASCH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract ** figure -; claim - *; | [I]EP0322046 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]) [I] 1-8,10 * abstract * * column 3, line 7 - line 22 * * column 5, line 28 - line 41 * * column 8, line 54 - line 58 * * column 9, line 1 - line 53 * * column 14, line 1 - line 42 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US7450019 (SPAIN ROBIN L [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 4, lines 6-18,63-67 * * column 5, lines 1-2,25-58 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2012168530 (ELLINGSON JON [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 7 * * page 2, paragraphs 19,20,22 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO2012106544 (TREVINO RAMIRO [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 4 * * page 6, paragraph 32 * * page 7, paragraph 34 * * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | DE3143910 | DE29715481U |