EP3339303 - ARYL AND HETEROARYL FUSED LACTAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [2018/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDWARDS, Martin Paul c/o Pfizer Inc. 10555 Science Center Drive San Diego, CA California 92121 / US | 02 /
KUMPF, Robert Arnold 3280 Avenida Anacapa Carlsbad, CA California 92009 / US | 03 /
KUNG, Pei-Pei 5504 Shannon Ridge Lane San Diego, CA California 92130 / US | 04 /
MCALPINE, Indrawan James 7190 Calabria Court Unit C San Diego, CA California 92122 / US | 05 /
NINKOVIC, Sacha 8902 Nottingham Place La Jolla, CA California 92037 / US | 06 /
RUI, Eugene Yuanjin 11254 Caminito Corriente San Diego, CA California 92128 / US | 07 /
SUTTON, Scott Channing 11660 Weatherwood Place San Diego, CA California 92131 / US | 08 /
TATLOCK, John Howard 10220 Camino San Thomas San Diego, CA California 92127 / US | 09 /
WYTHES, Martin James c/o Pfizer Inc. 10555 Science Center Drive San Diego, CA California 92121 / US | 10 /
ZEHNDER, Luke Raymond 4653 Rainier Avenue San Diego, CA California 92120 / US | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2018/26] | Application number, filing date | 17206218.4 | 05.12.2013 | [2018/26] | Priority number, date | US201261740596P | 21.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261740596 P | [2018/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3339303 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3339303 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP3339303 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/06, C07D401/14, C07D413/14, C07D403/14, C07D407/14, C07D413/06, C07D471/04, A61P35/00, A61K31/4725 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP,CN,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,CN,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07D403/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07D407/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07D413/06 (EP,CN,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,CN,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/26] | C07D401/06, C07D401/14, C07D413/14, C07D403/14, C07D407/14, C07D413/06, C07D471/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] |
Former [2018/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 02.01.2019 | ME | 02.01.2019 | Title | German: | KONDENSIERTE ARYL- UND HETEROARYLLACTAME | [2018/26] | English: | ARYL AND HETEROARYL FUSED LACTAMS | [2018/26] | French: | LACTAMES FUSIONNÉS À UN ARYLE ET HÉTÉROARYLE | [2018/26] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 02.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 20.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13817739.9 / EP2935238 | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 24.06.2020 | SM | 24.06.2020 | [2021/40] |
Former [2021/09] | SM | 24.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012118812 (EPIZYME INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2012142513 (EPIZYME INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15* claim 1 * | by applicant | WO9111172 | WO9402518 | WO9855148 | WO0035298 | US6106864 | - CREA et al., Crit. Rev. Oncol. Hematol., (20120000), vol. 83, pages 184 - 193 | - KLEER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20030000), vol. 100, pages 11606 - 11 | - MIMORI et al., Eur. J. Surg. Oncol., (20050000), vol. 31, pages 376 - 80 | - BACHMANN et al., J. Clin. Oncol., (20060000), vol. 24, pages 268 - 273 | - MATSUKAWA et al., Cancer Sci., (20060000), vol. 97, pages 484 - 491 | - SASAKI et al., Lab. Invest., (20080000), vol. 88, pages 873 - 882 | - SUDO et al., Br. J. Cancer, (20050000), vol. 92, no. 9, pages 1754 - 1758 | - BREUER et al., Neoplasia, (20040000), vol. 6, pages 736 - 43 | - LU et al., Cancer Res., (20070000), vol. 67, pages 1757 - 1768 | - OUGOLKOV et al., Clin. Cancer Res., (20080000), vol. 14, pages 6790 - 6796 | - VARAMBALLY et al., Nature, (20020000), vol. 419, pages 624 - 629 | - WAGENER et al., Int. J. Cancer, (20080000), vol. 123, pages 1545 - 1550 | - WEIKERT et al., Int. J. Mol. Med., (20050000), vol. 16, pages 349 - 353 | - FL. MORIN et al., Nat. Genetics, (20100200), vol. 42, no. 2, pages 181 - 185 | - MCCABE et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20120000), vol. 109, pages 2989 - 2994 | - MAJER et al., FEBS Letters, (20120000), vol. 586, pages 3448 - 3451 | - HALEBLIAN, J Pharm Sci, (19750800), vol. 64, no. 8, pages 1269 - 1288 | - T HIGUCHI; W STELLA, "Pro-drugs as Novel Delivery Systems", ACS Symposium Series, vol. 14 | - LIANG; CHEN, Expert Opinion in Therapeutic Patents, (20010000), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 981 - 986 | - H. LIEBERMAN; L. LACHMAN, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms: Tablets, Marcel Dekker, (19800000), vol. 1 | - VERMA et al., Pharmaceutical Technology On-line, (20010000), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 1 - 14 | - FINNIN; MORGAN, J Pharm Sci, (19991000), vol. 88, no. 10, pages 955 - 958 |