EP3498738 - A COATING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG Industries Ohio, Inc. 3800 West 143rd Street Cleveland, OH 44111 / US | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2019/25] | Application number, filing date | 17207692.9 | 15.12.2017 | [2019/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3498738 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/04, C08F2/22, C09D133/02, B65D81/00 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
C09D133/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2/04 (KR,US);
C08F2/22 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/04 (KR);
C08F220/06 (KR,US);
C08F220/1806 (KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C09D133/02, C08L33/02 (EP);
C08F220/1804, C08F220/06 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2019/25] | English: | A COATING COMPOSITION | [2019/25] | French: | COMPOSITION DE REVÊTEMENT | [2019/25] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2019/48] | 11.07.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3919154 (CHANG YUN-FENG, et al) [X] 1-8,11,15 * the whole document * * columns 1,2-4; example 7 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]WO2006045017 (VALSPAR SOURCING INC [US], et al) [X] 15 * the whole document * * example - * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]US2012149820 (FUHRY MARY ANN M [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document ** paragraphs [0010] - [0026] - [0 26] - [0027] - [0040] , [0046] , [0052] - [0054]; examples 8,11 *; | [XY]WO2016196190 (PPG IND OHIO INC [US]) [X] 15 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0033] - [0036] - [0045] , [0054] - [0058]; example - * [Y] 1-15 | by applicant | US8614286 | - The Chemistry and Application of Phenolic Resins or Phenoplasts, John Wiley and Sons/Cita Technology Limited, (19970000), vol. V | - "Surface Coating", Raw material and their usage, Chapman and Hall, vol. 1, page 106 |