EP3499513 - DETERMINING WHETHER A HYPOTHESIS CONCERNING A SIGNAL IS TRUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2019/25] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLDEGEBRIEL, Michael Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 4 02610 Espoo / FI | 02 /
HONKALA, Mikko Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 4 02610 Espoo / FI | 03 /
KARKKAIEN, Leo Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 4 02610 Espoo / FI | 04 /
RAJALA, Satu Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 4 02610 Espoo / FI | 05 /
LINDHOLM, Harri Mäkipellontie 10 A 00320 Helsinki / FI | [2019/25] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/25] | Higgin, Paul Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 17207764.6 | 15.12.2017 | [2019/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3499513 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G16H50/20, A61B5/00, A61B5/11, A61B5/316, A61B5/349 | [2024/31] | CPC: |
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
A61B5/352 (US);
A61B5/1102 (EP,US);
A61B5/316 (EP);
A61B5/349 (EP);
A61B5/353 (US);
A61B5/355 (US);
A61B5/358 (US);
A61B5/7221 (EP,US);
A61B5/7264 (EP,US);
G06F17/17 (US);
G06F17/18 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/25] | G16H50/20, A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/05] |
Former [2019/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESTIMMEN DER WAHRHEIT EINER HYPOTHESE BEZÜGLICH EINES SIGNALS | [2019/25] | English: | DETERMINING WHETHER A HYPOTHESIS CONCERNING A SIGNAL IS TRUE | [2019/25] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DE LA VÉRACITÉ D'UNE HYPOTHÈSE CONCERNANT UN SIGNAL | [2019/25] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/05] | 19.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003216654 (XU WEICHAO [CN], et al); | [I]US2006235319 (BELOHLAVEK MAREK [US], et al); | [I]US2007239043 (PATEL AMISHA S [US], et al); | [A]US2008147575 (ROY H SCOTT [US]); | [I]US2015282755 (DERICHE MOHAMED [SA], et al); |