EP3502315 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO COATINGS FOR METAL ALLOY COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mathai, Manu c/o Ruston House, Waterside South Lincoln, LN5 7FD / GB | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/26] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17208479.0 | 19.12.2017 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3502315 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C23C24/00, C23C24/08, C23C28/02, B05B7/14, C23C10/48, C23C24/04, C23C30/00 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
C23C30/00 (EP);
C23C10/28 (EP);
C23C24/04 (EP);
C25D5/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT BESCHICHTUNGEN FÜR METALLLEGIERUNGSKOMPONENTEN | [2019/26] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO COATINGS FOR METAL ALLOY COMPONENTS | [2019/26] | French: | AMÉLIORATIONS APPORTÉES À DES REVÊTEMENTS POUR DES COMPOSANTS D'ALLIAGE MÉTALLIQUE | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 06.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US6372321 (RIGNEY JOSEPH D [US], et al) [X] 1,6,8 * figures 1-5; claims 1-10 * [Y] 5,7,9-13 [I] 2-4; | [Y]EP2072759 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 5,7 * paragraphs [0033] , [0 36] *; | [Y]US6435835 (ALLEN WILLIAM PATRICK [US], et al) [Y] 9 * claim 1 *; | [XYI]EP1712657 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 14 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 2] , [0 12] , [0 15] , [0 16] , [0 19] , [0 22] , [0 24] , [0 25]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 10-13 [I] 15; | [A]WO0185386 (OPTOMEC DESIGN [US]) [A] 15 * page 18 - page 19; figure 11 *; | [A]EP2781616 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [A] 4,14,15 * figure 1; claims 13,16-19 *; | [A]EP2612954 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 2,3,10,11 * claims 1-20 * | by applicant | US6514629 | US7989020 | US7749569 |