EP3337162 - INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2020/45] | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | ||
Former [2018/25] | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | ||
For all designated states Arriola, George 6080 Center Drive 10th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90045 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARRIOLA, George 6080 Center Drive 10th Floor Los Angeles California 90045 / US | 02 /
BAGU CASAS, Anahi c/o Sony Network Entertainment International LLC 6080 Center Drive, 10th Floor Los Angeles California 90045 / US | 03 /
KIMURA, Shinji c/o Sony Network Entertainment International LLC 6080 Center Drive, 10th Floor Los Angeles California 90045 / US | 04 /
ENOMOTO, Shigeru c/o Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 05 /
YAMANAKA, Yasuhiro c/o Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 06 /
KOBAYASHI, Motoki c/o Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 07 /
HIRAMATSU, Shuji c/o Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 08 /
TANAKA, Yumiko c/o Sony Network Entertainment International LLC 6080 Center Drive, 10th Floor Los Angeles California 90045 / US | 09 /
SUGAWARA, Taku c/o Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2018/25] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/25] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 17208577.1 | 30.10.2013 | [2018/25] | Priority number, date | US201261721572P | 02.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261721572 P | [2018/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3337162 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3337162 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3337162 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445, G06F3/0481 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
H04N21/43072 (EP,US);
H04N21/431 (US);
A63F13/40 (US);
A63F13/52 (US);
G06F16/904 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F3/0484 (US);
H04N21/42204 (US);
H04N21/42209 (US);
H04N21/4312 (EP,US);
H04N21/4314 (US);
H04N21/4316 (US);
H04N21/47 (US);
H04N21/4781 (EP,US);
H04N21/4782 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/25] | H04N5/445 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/25] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2018/25] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD | [2018/25] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2018/25] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/25] | 24.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.10.2019 | 25.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 02.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13851372.6 / EP2915328 | Divisional application(s) | EP20174161.8 / EP3720117 | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2013 | AL | 08.07.2020 | AT | 08.07.2020 | CY | 08.07.2020 | CZ | 08.07.2020 | DK | 08.07.2020 | EE | 08.07.2020 | ES | 08.07.2020 | FI | 08.07.2020 | HR | 08.07.2020 | IT | 08.07.2020 | LT | 08.07.2020 | LV | 08.07.2020 | MC | 08.07.2020 | MK | 08.07.2020 | MT | 08.07.2020 | NL | 08.07.2020 | PL | 08.07.2020 | RO | 08.07.2020 | RS | 08.07.2020 | SE | 08.07.2020 | SI | 08.07.2020 | SK | 08.07.2020 | SM | 08.07.2020 | TR | 08.07.2020 | BG | 08.10.2020 | NO | 08.10.2020 | GR | 09.10.2020 | IE | 30.10.2020 | LU | 30.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | IS | 08.11.2020 | PT | 09.11.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.10.2013 | |
AL | 08.07.2020 | ||
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CY | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
MT | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
TR | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IE | 30.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IE | 30.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
LU | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 08.07.2020 | |
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 08.07.2020 | |
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005210410 (OHWA TSUNAYUKI [JP], et al) [I] 1-9 * the whole document * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0138]; figures 5,7-15 *; | [I]US2009172598 (YAMANAKA YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1-9 * the whole document * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0071]; figures 3-11 *; | [A]US2009193461 (YUKI TAICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9* paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0062]; figures 3, 4, 6 *; | [I]US2012221971 (TROTTA NICHOLAS [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * the whole document * * page 2 - page 4; figures 1,4-5 * |