EP3501934 - COOLING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR A DUAL-POWERED RAILROAD VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Energy Switzerland AG Bruggerstrasse 72 5400 Baden / CH | [2022/03] |
Former [2020/31] | For all designated states ABB Power Grids Switzerland AG Bruggerstrasse 72 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2020/28] | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Bruggerstrasse 66 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2019/26] | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zueger, Harry 7, Chemin de I'Etang 1217 Châtelaine/Genève / CH | 02 /
Cuenin, Yann Chemin du Four 12 1969 Saint-Martin / CH | 03 /
Alphand, Yoann 6 rue de l'ill 67640 Fegersheim / FR | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Postfach 20 07 34 80007 München / DE | [2021/09] |
Former [2019/26] | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17208669.6 | 19.12.2017 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3501934 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3501934 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B61C7/04, B61C17/04, F01P3/20, F01P7/16, B60K6/20, B60K11/02, // F01P5/12 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
B61C7/04 (EP,US);
B61C5/02 (US);
B60K11/02 (EP);
B60L1/003 (EP);
B60L1/02 (EP);
B60L3/0023 (EP);
B60L50/15 (EP);
B61C17/04 (EP,US);
F01P3/20 (EP,US);
F01P5/12 (US);
F01P7/161 (US);
F01P7/165 (EP,US);
B60L2200/26 (EP);
B60Y2200/31 (EP);
F01P2005/125 (EP,US);
F01P2050/24 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/46] | B60K6/20, B60K11/02 | ||
Former IPC [2019/26] | B61C7/04, B61C17/04, F01P3/20, F01P7/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/03] |
Former [2019/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KÜHLSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR EIN DOPPELT ANGETRIEBENES SCHIENENFAHRZEUG | [2019/26] | English: | COOLING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR A DUAL-POWERED RAILROAD VEHICLE | [2019/26] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE REFROIDISSEMENT POUR VÉHICULE FERROVIAIRE À ALIMENTATION DOUBLE | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/03] | 09.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2017 | AL | 03.03.2021 | AT | 03.03.2021 | CY | 03.03.2021 | CZ | 03.03.2021 | DK | 03.03.2021 | EE | 03.03.2021 | FI | 03.03.2021 | HR | 03.03.2021 | IT | 03.03.2021 | LT | 03.03.2021 | LV | 03.03.2021 | MC | 03.03.2021 | NL | 03.03.2021 | PL | 03.03.2021 | RO | 03.03.2021 | RS | 03.03.2021 | SE | 03.03.2021 | SI | 03.03.2021 | SK | 03.03.2021 | SM | 03.03.2021 | BG | 03.06.2021 | NO | 03.06.2021 | GR | 04.06.2021 | IS | 03.07.2021 | PT | 05.07.2021 | [2023/33] |
Former [2023/30] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5255733 (KING EDWARD T [US]) [Y] 13 * column 5, line 1 - line 25 *; | [A]EP0578549 (GEC ALSTHOM TRANSPORT SA [FR]) [A] 14* figures 1-4 *; | [A]JP2009067087 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [A] 1,4-6,8-12 * figure 1 *; | [YA]EP2689983 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-6,8-15 * figure 2 * [A] 7; | [Y]US2014124170 (YOUNG HENRY TODD [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-15 * figure 1 * * page 1, column 1, paragraph 0002 * * page 1, column 1, paragraph 0006 * * page 2, column 2, paragraph 0019 * |