EP3502687 - DETERMINATION OF GAS PARAMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensirion AG Laubisrütistrasse 50 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORNUNG, Mark c/o Sensirion AG Laubisrütistrasse 50 8712 Stäfa / CH | 02 /
RÜEGG, Andreas c/o Sensirion AG Laubisrütistrasse 50 8712 Stäfa / CH | 03 /
KILIANI, David c/o Sensirion AG Laubisrütistrasse 50 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Piticco, Lorena, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [2022/26] |
Former [2019/26] | Strässle, Simon Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 17208745.4 | 20.12.2017 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3502687 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3502687 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/22, G01N25/18, // G01N27/18 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
G01N33/225 (EP);
G01F1/00 (CN);
G01N25/18 (EP);
G01N25/20 (CN);
G01N33/00 (CN);
G01N33/005 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] |
Former [2019/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG VON GASPARAMETERN | [2019/26] | English: | DETERMINATION OF GAS PARAMETERS | [2019/26] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DE PARAMÈTRES DE GAZ | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 05.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2017 | AL | 29.06.2022 | AT | 29.06.2022 | CY | 29.06.2022 | CZ | 29.06.2022 | DK | 29.06.2022 | EE | 29.06.2022 | ES | 29.06.2022 | FI | 29.06.2022 | HR | 29.06.2022 | LT | 29.06.2022 | LV | 29.06.2022 | MC | 29.06.2022 | MK | 29.06.2022 | MT | 29.06.2022 | NL | 29.06.2022 | PL | 29.06.2022 | RO | 29.06.2022 | RS | 29.06.2022 | SE | 29.06.2022 | SI | 29.06.2022 | SK | 29.06.2022 | SM | 29.06.2022 | BG | 29.09.2022 | NO | 29.09.2022 | GR | 30.09.2022 | IS | 29.10.2022 | PT | 31.10.2022 | IE | 20.12.2022 | LU | 20.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | CH | 31.12.2022 | LI | 31.12.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 20.12.2017 | |
AL | 29.06.2022 | ||
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CY | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
MK | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
IE | 20.12.2022 | ||
LU | 20.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 20.12.2017 | |
AL | 29.06.2022 | ||
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CY | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MK | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
IE | 20.12.2022 | ||
LU | 20.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 20.12.2017 | |
AL | 29.06.2022 | ||
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CY | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
IE | 20.12.2022 | ||
LU | 20.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 20.12.2017 | |
AL | 29.06.2022 | ||
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
IE | 20.12.2022 | ||
LU | 20.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
IE | 20.12.2022 | ||
LU | 20.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
IE | 20.12.2022 | ||
LU | 20.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
LU | 20.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
LU | 20.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
NL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010154510 (VIENS JEAN FRANCOIS [CA], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0052] *; | [A]US2011126611 (BIERL RUDOLF [DE], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0009] , [ 0020] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0050]; figures 1-3 *; | [AD]WO2015075278 (SENSIRION AG [CH]) [AD] 1-17* page 2 - page 4 *; | [I]US2016138951 (PRETRE PHILIPPE [CH]) [I] 1,3-10,13-15,17 * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0123]; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | US5050429 | US6019505 | WO0198736 | DE10122039 | US2004099057 | EP1426740 | EP1840535 | EP2015056 | WO2012021999 | EP2527779 | WO2015075278 | EP3153854 |