EP3502789 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL ELEMENT ON A TIMEPIECE COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETA SA Manufacture Horlogère Suisse Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 2540 Grenchen / CH | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAILLARD, Brice 144 rue du Général Dufour 2502 Bienne / CH | 02 /
MIHAILOVIC, Vlada Hauptstrasse 23 4556 Burgäschi / CH | 03 /
JÄGGI, Félix Rue du Châtelet 21 2504 Bienne / CH | 04 /
EMMENEGGER, Christophe Impasse du Plan 3 1730 Ecuvillens / CH | 05 /
JEANRENAUD, Frédéric Dr Dubois 6 2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | ICB SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital, 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 17209106.8 | 20.12.2017 | [2019/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3502789 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G04B19/12, G04B45/00, B33Y80/00, B29C64/112 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
B29C64/112 (EP,KR,US);
B29C64/393 (KR);
B29C64/386 (US);
B29C64/209 (KR);
B29C64/264 (KR);
B29C64/314 (KR);
B29C64/336 (KR);
B33Y10/00 (KR,US);
B33Y30/00 (KR);
B33Y40/00 (KR);
B33Y50/02 (KR,US);
B33Y70/00 (KR,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,KR,US);
G04B19/12 (EP,KR,US);
G04B45/0015 (EP,KR,US);
G04B45/0076 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERSTELLUNG EINES 3D-ELEMENTS AUF EINER UHRKOMPONENTE | [2019/26] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL ELEMENT ON A TIMEPIECE COMPONENT | [2019/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALISATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT TRIDIMENSIONNEL SUR UN COMPOSANT HORLOGER | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 13.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP3002107 (MIMAKI ENG KK [JP]) [I] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]WO2016116748 (UNIV GREENWICH [GB]) [I] 1-15 * rev.s 1,9 et 12, page 1, l. 1-6, p. 2, l. 26-33, p.4, l. 30 à p.5, l. 21-35, p.10, l.25-28 et p.11, l. 1-4, Fig.s 5,11 *; | [E]EP3323530 (MONTFORT WATCHES SA [CH], et al) [E] 1 * paragraph [0013]; figures 1-6; claims 1,8 *; | [I] - Sculpteo, "Techniques et technologies pour impression 3D et imprimantes3D", (20170711), pages 1 - 8, URL: https://www.sculpteo.com/fr/impression-3d/technologies-dimpression-3d/, (20180601), XP055480603 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP2370865 |