EP3502797 - TIMEPIECE COMPRISING A MECHANICAL OSCILLATOR ASSOCIATED WITH A CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Swatch Group Research and Development Ltd Rue des Sors 3 2074 Marin / CH | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tombez, Lionel Ch. des Vignes perdues 25b 2022 Bevaix / CH | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | ICB SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital, 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 17209121.7 | 20.12.2017 | [2019/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3502797 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3502797 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G04C10/00, G04C3/04 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
G04C3/04 (EP,CN,US);
G04C3/068 (US);
G04B17/06 (US);
G04C10/00 (EP,CN,US);
G04G19/06 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/26] | G04C10/00, G04C3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] |
Former [2019/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | UHRWERKSANORDNUNG, DIE EINEN MECHANISCHEN OSZILLATOR UMFASST, DER MIT EINER EINSTELLVORRICHTUNG VERBUNDEN IST | [2019/26] | English: | TIMEPIECE COMPRISING A MECHANICAL OSCILLATOR ASSOCIATED WITH A CONTROL SYSTEM | [2019/26] | French: | PIECE D'HORLOGERIE COMPRENANT UN OSCILLATEUR MECANIQUE ASSOCIE A UN SYSTEME DE REGULATION | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 02.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2017 | AL | 08.07.2020 | AT | 08.07.2020 | CY | 08.07.2020 | CZ | 08.07.2020 | DK | 08.07.2020 | EE | 08.07.2020 | ES | 08.07.2020 | FI | 08.07.2020 | HR | 08.07.2020 | IT | 08.07.2020 | LT | 08.07.2020 | LV | 08.07.2020 | MC | 08.07.2020 | MK | 08.07.2020 | MT | 08.07.2020 | NL | 08.07.2020 | PL | 08.07.2020 | RO | 08.07.2020 | RS | 08.07.2020 | SE | 08.07.2020 | SI | 08.07.2020 | SK | 08.07.2020 | SM | 08.07.2020 | TR | 08.07.2020 | BG | 08.10.2020 | NO | 08.10.2020 | GR | 09.10.2020 | IS | 08.11.2020 | PT | 09.11.2020 | IE | 20.12.2020 | LU | 20.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.12.2017 | |
AL | 08.07.2020 | ||
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CY | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
MT | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
TR | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 20.12.2020 | ||
LU | 20.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
IE | 20.12.2020 | ||
LU | 20.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 08.07.2020 | |
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 08.07.2020 | |
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP1241538 (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [AD] 1-22 * paragraphs [0001] - [0002] * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraphs [0011] , [0013] * * paragraphs [0018] , [0020] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraphs [0075] - [0077] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0094] * * paragraphs [0095] - [0096] * * paragraph [0098] * * paragraphs [0102] - [0105] * * paragraphs [0114] - [0117] * * paragraph [0122] * * figures 1,7,10 *; | [A]US2013051191 (SCHAFROTH KONRAD [CH]) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraphs [0007] - [0008] * * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0022] ** figures 1,2,7,8 * | by applicant | CH597636 | EP1241538 | EP1521142 |