EP3327016 - PREPARATION OF MODULATORS OF ATP-BINDING CASSETTE TRANSPORTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated 50 Northern Avenue Boston, MA 02210 / US | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUAH, Sara S. Hadida 2356 Torrey Pines Road 16 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 02 /
GROOTENHUIS, Peter D.J. 1955 Jimmy Durante Boulevard Del Mar, CA 92104 / US | 03 /
VAN GOOR, Fredrick 832 Ormond Court San Diego, CA 92109 / US | 04 /
ZHOU, Jinglan 4466 Shorepointe Way San Diego, CA 92109 / US | 05 /
BEAR, Brian 7010 Sitio Corazon Carlsbad, CA 92109 / US | 06 /
MILLER, Mark T. 5075 La Jolla Blvd. 9 San Diego, CA 92109 / US | 07 /
MCCARTNEY, Jason 1428 Kings Cross Drive Cardiff By The Sea, CA 92007 / US | 08 /
NUMA, Mehdi, Michel, Jamel 4664 36th Street San Diego, CA 92116 / US | 09 /
YANG, Xiaoqing 4526 Vareda Mar de Ponderosa San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2018/26] |
Former [2018/22] | 01 /
RUAH, Sara S. Hadida 2356 Torrey Pines Road 16 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | ||
02 /
GROOTENHUIS, Peter D.J. 4801 Riding Ridge Road San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
03 /
VAN GOOR, Fredrick 832 Ormond Court San Diego, CA 92109 / US | |||
04 /
ZHOU, Jinglan 4466 Shorepointe Way San Diego, CA 92109 / US | |||
05 /
BEAR, Brian 7010 Sitio Corazon Carlsbad, CA 92109 / US | |||
06 /
MILLER, Mark T. 5075 La Jolla Blvd. 9 San Diego, CA 92109 / US | |||
07 /
MCCARTNEY, Jason 1429 Kings Cross Drive Cardiff By The Sea, CA 92007 / US | |||
08 /
NUMA, Mehdi, Michel, Jamel 4664 36th Street San Diego, CA 92116 / US | |||
09 /
YANG, Xiaoqing 4526 Vareda Mar de Ponderosa San Diego, CA 92130 / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2018/22] | Application number, filing date | 17209175.3 | 09.04.2007 | [2018/22] | Priority number, date | US20060790459P | 07.04.2006 Original published format: US 790459 P | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3327016 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3327016 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/12, C07D405/14, C07D471/04 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/445 (US);
A61K31/496 (US);
A61K31/5377 (US);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P11/12 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/06 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P5/18 (EP);
A61P5/48 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P7/12 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
C07B59/002 (US);
C07D209/08 (EP);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
G01N33/5008 (US);
G01N33/6872 (US);
C07B2200/05 (US);
G01N2333/705 (US);
G01N2500/02 (US);
G01N2500/10 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/52] |
Former [2018/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON MODULATOREN VON ATP-BINDENDEN KASSETTENTRANSPORTERN | [2018/22] | English: | PREPARATION OF MODULATORS OF ATP-BINDING CASSETTE TRANSPORTERS | [2018/22] | French: | PRÉPARATION DES MODULATEURS DE TRANSPORTEURS DE CASSETTE À LIAISON ATP | [2018/22] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 20.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 26.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07755298.2 / EP2007756 | EP13167785.8 / EP2674428 | EP16155334.2 / EP3091011 | Divisional application(s) | EP21156114.7 / EP3882245 | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/21] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 26.01.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 26.01.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.02.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 31.01.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 31.01.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.02.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.06.2021 | CY | 16.06.2021 | DK | 16.06.2021 | EE | 16.06.2021 | FI | 16.06.2021 | LT | 16.06.2021 | LV | 16.06.2021 | MC | 16.06.2021 | SE | 16.06.2021 | GR | 17.09.2021 | PT | 18.10.2021 | [2024/20] |
Former [2023/06] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
LT | 16.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03002533 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 75; example 122 * * page 16, line 11 - line 27 *; | [I]EP1380576 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-7 * pages 171,175,, column 182; examples I-85,I-159,II-25 *; | [X]WO2004035571 (RIGEL PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * pages 26,33; claims 1,25; compounds 5D,231 ** paragraph [00104] - paragraph [00110] *; | [I]WO2004041277 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [I] 1-7 * pages 83,89; examples 3-78,5; claims 1,15,18 *; | [I]WO2004056745 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [I] 1-7 * page 2, line 31 * *Scheme 2*; page 5, paragraph 1; example -; claims 1,13,16 *; | [X]WO2005016884 (LUNDBECK & CO AS H [DK], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 7, line 30; claims 1,113,114 *; | [X]WO2005075435 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 95, paragraphs 67,72; claims 1,129,131; table 1; compound 245 * | by applicant | US5304121 | US5886026 | US6099562 | - GREGORY, R. J. et al., Nature, (19900000), vol. 347, pages 382 - 386 | - RICH, D. P. et al., Nature, (19900000), vol. 347, pages 358 - 362 | - RIORDAN, J. R. et al., Science, (19890000), vol. 245, pages 1066 - 1073 | - CUTTING, G. R. et al., Nature, (19900000), vol. 346, pages 366 - 369 | - DEAN, M. et al., Cell, (19900000), vol. 61, pages 863 - 870 | - KEREM, B-S. et al., Science, (19890000), vol. 245, pages 1073 - 1080 | - KEREM, B-S et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 8447 - 8451 | - QUINTON, P. M., FASEB J., (19900000), vol. 4, pages 2709 - 2727 | - DALEMANS et al., Nature Lond., (19910000), vol. 354, pages 526 - 528 | - PASYK; FOSKETT, J. Cell. Biochem., (19950000), vol. 270, pages 12347 - 12350 | - ARIDOR M et al., Nature Med., (19990000), vol. 5, no. 7, pages 745 - 751 | - SHASTRY, B.S et al., Neurochem. International, (20030000), vol. 43, pages 1 - 7 | - RUTISHAUSER, J. et al., Swiss Med Wkly, (20020000), vol. 132, pages 211 - 222 | - MORELLO, JP et al., TIPS, (20000000), vol. 21, pages 466 - 469 | - BROSS P. et al., Human Mut., (19990000), vol. 14, pages 186 - 198 | - HWANG, T. C. et al., J. Gen. Physiol., (19980000), vol. 111, no. 3, pages 477 - 490 | - FREIREICH et al., Cancer Chemother. Rep., (19660000), vol. 50, page 219 | - Scientific Tables, Geigy Pharmaceuticals, Ardsley, (19700000), vol. 537 | - Angew. Chem., (20050000), vol. 44, page 606 | - J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20050000), vol. 127, page 5342 | - J. Comb. Chem., (20050000), vol. 7, page 130 | - Tetrahedron, (20060000), vol. 62, page 3439 | - J. Chem. Soc. Perkin Trans., (20000000), vol. 1, page 1045 | - S. M. BERGE et al., "pharmaceutically acceptable salts", J. Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19770000), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - GONZALEZ, J. E.; R. Y. TSIEN, "Voltage sensing by fluorescence resonance energy transfer in single cells", Biophys J, (19950000), vol. 69, no. 4, pages 1272 - 1280, XP000961694 | - GONZALEZ, J. E.; R. Y. TSIEN, "Improved indicators of cell membrane potential that use fluorescence resonance energy transfer", Chem Biol, (19970000), vol. 4, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/S1074-5521(97)90070-3, pages 269 - 277, XP000961796 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-5521(97)90070-3 | - GONZALEZ; J. E. et al., "Cell-based assays and instrumentation for screening ion-channel targets", Drug Discov Today, (19990000), vol. 4, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1016/S1359-6446(99)01383-5, pages 431 - 439, XP001026838 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6446(99)01383-5 |