EP3501247 - A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A DRIVING CONDITION FOR A TRACTOR OF AN AGRICULTURAL MACHINE AND AN AGRICULTURAL MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kverneland Group Mechatronics BV Hoofdweg 1278 2153 LR Nieuw-Vennep / NL | [2019/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIESENBEEK, Sander Winterpark 2 2152 HA Nieuw-Vennep / NL | 02 /
VAN DER VLUGT, Peter R.P. Geerlingsdreef 9 2135 HR Hoofddorp / NL | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Bittner, Thomas L. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 17209491.4 | 21.12.2017 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3501247 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3501247 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A01B69/00, // G01G19/08, G01G23/00, A01C17/00, A01C21/00 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
A01B69/007 (EP);
G05D1/021 (US);
A01C15/006 (US);
A01C21/00 (EP,US);
G01G19/08 (EP,US);
G05D1/0094 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/26] | A01B59/06, A01B79/00, A01C15/00, A01C17/00, G01G19/08, G01G23/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES FAHRZUSTANDS FÜR EINEN TRAKTOR EINER LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHEN MASCHINE SOWIE EINE LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHE MASCHINE | [2019/26] | English: | A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A DRIVING CONDITION FOR A TRACTOR OF AN AGRICULTURAL MACHINE AND AN AGRICULTURAL MACHINE | [2019/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR COMMANDER UN ÉTAT D'ENTRAÎNEMENT D'UN TRACTEUR D'UNE MACHINE AGRICOLE ET MACHINE AGRICOLE | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 20.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2017 | AL | 08.04.2020 | AT | 08.04.2020 | CY | 08.04.2020 | CZ | 08.04.2020 | EE | 08.04.2020 | FI | 08.04.2020 | HR | 08.04.2020 | LT | 08.04.2020 | LV | 08.04.2020 | MC | 08.04.2020 | MK | 08.04.2020 | MT | 08.04.2020 | PL | 08.04.2020 | RO | 08.04.2020 | RS | 08.04.2020 | SE | 08.04.2020 | SI | 08.04.2020 | SK | 08.04.2020 | SM | 08.04.2020 | TR | 08.04.2020 | BG | 08.07.2020 | NO | 08.07.2020 | GR | 09.07.2020 | IS | 08.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | IE | 21.12.2020 | LU | 21.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 21.12.2017 | |
AL | 08.04.2020 | ||
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
MT | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
TR | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 21.12.2020 | ||
LU | 21.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 21.12.2020 | ||
LU | 21.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 21.12.2020 | ||
LU | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 21.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 08.04.2020 | |
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 08.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3642502 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * column 3, line 27 - column 7, line 27; figures 1-3 *; | [AD]EP0537857 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]) [AD] 1-12 * page 3, lines 28-54 * * column 4, lines 25-55; figures 1, 6-9 *; | [YD]EP0797082 (GREENLAND NIEUW VENNEP BV [NL]) [YD] 1-12 * column 1, lines 32-41 * * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 28; figures 1-3 *; | [A]JP2004329067 (YANMAR CO LTD) [A] 1-12* abstract * | by applicant | EP0407705 | EP0537857 | EP0797082 |