EP3503601 - TECHNIQUES FOR INITIATING A ROAMING COMMUNICATION LINK WITH A USER EQUIPMENT IN A VISITED COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2020/06] |
Former [2019/26] | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lauster, Reinhard Südtirolerstraße 30 3100 St. Pölten / AT | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [2020/06] |
Former [2019/26] | Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elsenheimerstraße 65 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17210081.0 | 22.12.2017 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3503601 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3503601 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/02, H04W8/06, H04W8/12 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
H04W8/02 (EP);
H04W8/06 (EP);
H04W8/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Title | German: | TECHNIKEN ZUR INITIIERUNG EINER ROAMING-KOMMUNIKATIONSVERBINDUNG MIT EINEM BENUTZERGERÄT IN EINEM BESUCHTEN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | [2019/26] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR INITIATING A ROAMING COMMUNICATION LINK WITH A USER EQUIPMENT IN A VISITED COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2019/26] | French: | TECHNIQUES POUR INITIER UNE LIAISON DE COMMUNICATION D'ITINÉRANCE AVEC UN ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION VISITÉ | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2018 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 04.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.02.2020 | CY | 05.02.2020 | DK | 05.02.2020 | EE | 05.02.2020 | FI | 05.02.2020 | HR | 05.02.2020 | LT | 05.02.2020 | LV | 05.02.2020 | MC | 05.02.2020 | MK | 05.02.2020 | MT | 05.02.2020 | RS | 05.02.2020 | SE | 05.02.2020 | SI | 05.02.2020 | SM | 05.02.2020 | TR | 05.02.2020 | BG | 05.05.2020 | NO | 05.05.2020 | IS | 05.06.2020 | PT | 28.06.2020 | [2023/41] |
Former [2022/33] | AL | 05.02.2020 | |
CY | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
MK | 05.02.2020 | ||
MT | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
TR | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/31] | AL | 05.02.2020 | |
CY | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
MK | 05.02.2020 | ||
MT | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
TR | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | CY | 05.02.2020 | |
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
MT | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
TR | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | DK | 05.02.2020 | |
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | DK | 05.02.2020 | |
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 05.02.2020 | |
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 05.02.2020 | |
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
NO | 05.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2013124334 (BUZZINBEES [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,12,14,15 * page 10 - page 18; figures 1-4 * * page 7 * * page 1 - page 2 * * page 26 * [Y] 4,6-11,13; | [YA] - SHIN MYUNG-KI ET AL, "A way forward for accommodating NFV in 3GPP 5G systems", 2017 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGY CONVERGENCE (ICTC), IEEE, (20171018), doi:10.1109/ICTC.2017.8190953, pages 114 - 116, XP033268393 [Y] 4,6-11,13 * abstract * * page 115, column 1; figure 3 * * page 116, column 1 * [A] 1-3,5,12,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICTC.2017.8190953 | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Procedures for the 5G System; Stage 2 (Release 15)", (20171215), 3GPP DRAFT; 23502-200, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/Latest_SA2_Specs/Latest_draft_S2_Specs/23502-200.doc, (20171215), XP051379274 [A] 6-11 * page 85; figures 4.3.5.7-1 * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; System Architecture for the 5G System; Stage 2 (Release 15)", (20171215), 3GPP DRAFT; 23501-201, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/Latest_SA2_Specs/Latest_draft_S2_Specs/23501-201.doc, (20171215), XP051379271 [A] 6-11 * pages 26, 68 * | [T] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals; 5G System - Phase 1; CT WG4 Aspects (Release 15)", 3GPP STANDARD ; TECHNICAL REPORT ; 3GPP TR 29.891, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20170904), vol. CT WG4, no. V1.0.0, pages 1 - 132, XP051336828 |