EP3343955 - ASSEMBLY FOR HEARING AID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | [2022/27] |
Former [2018/27] | For all designated states Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MØLLER, Kenneth Rueskov c/o Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 DK-2765 Smørum / DK | 02 /
TROELSEN, Jens c/o Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 DK-2765 Smørum / DK | 03 /
SØ, Rune c/o Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 DK-2765 Smørum / DK | 04 /
SUNDBERG, Oliver Guldbergsgade 78, 4. th DK-2200 København N / DK | 05 /
DANIELSEN, Finn c/o Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 DK-2765 Smørum / DK | 06 /
JOHANSEN, Jesper B. c/o Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 DK-2765 Smørum / DK | 07 /
SAGER, Mads c/o Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 DK-2765 Smørum / DK | 08 /
PETERSEN, Svend Oscar c/o Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 DK-2765 Smørum / DK | 09 /
JAKOBSEN, Bent c/o Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 DK-2765 Smørum / DK | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Postfach 10 18 30 40009 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/27] | Demant Demant A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | ||
Former [2018/27] | William Demant Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | Application number, filing date | 17210257.6 | 22.12.2017 | [2018/27] | Priority number, date | EP20160207295 | 29.12.2016 Original published format: EP 16207295 | EP20160207304 | 29.12.2016 Original published format: EP 16207304 | EP20170155097 | 08.02.2017 Original published format: EP 17155097 | EP20170155099 | 08.02.2017 Original published format: EP 17155099 | EP20170160848 | 14.03.2017 Original published format: EP 17160848 | [2018/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3343955 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3343955 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
H04R25/554 (EP,US);
H04R25/50 (CN);
H04R25/607 (EP,US);
H04R25/505 (US);
H04R25/55 (US);
H04R25/65 (US);
H04R2225/0216 (EP,US);
H04R2225/025 (US);
H04R2225/43 (CN);
H04R2225/51 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] |
Former [2018/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG FÜR EIN HÖRGERÄT | [2018/27] | English: | ASSEMBLY FOR HEARING AID | [2018/27] | French: | ENSEMBLE POUR PROTHÈSE AUDITIVE | [2018/27] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 04.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.04.2023
11.04.2023
ADMISSIBLE Sivantos Pte. Ltd. 18 Tai Seng Street No. 08-08 18 Tai Seng Singapore 539775 / SG Opponent's representative FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2023/20] |
Former [2023/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.04.2023
Sivantos Pte. Ltd. 18 Tai Seng Street No. 08-08 18 Tai Seng Singapore 539775 / SG Opponent's representative FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | 25.04.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.09.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.06.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.07.2024 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.07.2024 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 05.09.2024 | Appeal received No. T1155/24 | 05.09.2024 | Payment of appeal fee | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2017 | AL | 06.07.2022 | AT | 06.07.2022 | BG | 06.07.2022 | CY | 06.07.2022 | CZ | 06.07.2022 | EE | 06.07.2022 | ES | 06.07.2022 | FI | 06.07.2022 | HR | 06.07.2022 | IT | 06.07.2022 | LT | 06.07.2022 | LV | 06.07.2022 | MC | 06.07.2022 | MK | 06.07.2022 | MT | 06.07.2022 | NL | 06.07.2022 | PL | 06.07.2022 | RO | 06.07.2022 | RS | 06.07.2022 | SE | 06.07.2022 | SI | 06.07.2022 | SK | 06.07.2022 | SM | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.10.2022 | GR | 07.10.2022 | IS | 06.11.2022 | PT | 07.11.2022 | IE | 22.12.2022 | LU | 22.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 22.12.2017 | |
AL | 06.07.2022 | ||
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
CY | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
IT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
MK | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
IE | 22.12.2022 | ||
LU | 22.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/29] | HU | 22.12.2017 | |
AL | 06.07.2022 | ||
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CY | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
IT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
MK | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
IE | 22.12.2022 | ||
LU | 22.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 22.12.2017 | |
AL | 06.07.2022 | ||
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CY | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
IT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MK | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
IE | 22.12.2022 | ||
LU | 22.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 22.12.2017 | |
AL | 06.07.2022 | ||
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CY | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
IT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
IE | 22.12.2022 | ||
LU | 22.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 22.12.2017 | |
AL | 06.07.2022 | ||
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
IT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
IE | 22.12.2022 | ||
LU | 22.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
IT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
IE | 22.12.2022 | ||
LU | 22.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
IE | 22.12.2022 | ||
LU | 22.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
IE | 22.12.2022 | ||
LU | 22.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
LU | 22.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
ES | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
PL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
PT | 07.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
NL | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 06.07.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPS6298594 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [XA]EP2088804 (STARKEY LAB INC [US]); | [YA]WO2010033932 (EARLENS CORP [US], et al); | [YA]US2010186995 (YEH SHIH-KUN [TW]); | [YA]US2014328507 (RABEL JAY [US], et al); | [YA]US2016373867 (OZDEN SINASI [DK]) | Opposition | EP1531649 | US2006227989 | EP1496530 | WO2009049646 | EP2076065 | EP2088804 | EP1768449 | EP2227040 | US2010321269 | US2011243357 | EP2750409 | US2014328507 | WO2015127972 | EP2456235 | US2015296312 | US2016373867 |