EP3326899 - WIND TURBINE MOORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Windcat Workboats Limited Holly Grove Cottage Hardhorn Village Poulton Le Fylde, Lancashire FY6 8DJ / GB | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clarkson, Neil M Holly Grove Cottage Hardhorn Village Poulton Le Fylde, Lancashire FY6 8DJ / GB | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Stevenson-Hill, Jack Patrick Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [2018/22] | Application number, filing date | 17210465.5 | 03.02.2014 | [2018/22] | Priority number, date | GB20130001949 | 04.02.2013 Original published format: GB 201301949 | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3326899 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3326899 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B63B21/16, B63B59/02 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
B63B27/30 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B63B21/16 (KR,US);
B63B21/00 (GB);
B63B21/04 (KR,US);
B63B39/005 (EP,KR,US);
B63B45/08 (KR);
B63B59/02 (EP,GB,KR,US);
B63H21/17 (KR);
B63H25/42 (EP,KR,US);
B66D1/50 (KR);
E02B3/20 (KR);
G08B3/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] |
Former [2019/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | ||
Former [2018/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WINDTURBINENVERANKERUNGSSYSTEM | [2018/22] | English: | WIND TURBINE MOORING SYSTEM | [2018/22] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ANCRAGE POUR ÉOLIENNE | [2018/22] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/02] | 30.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14702942.5 / EP2804805 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2020 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.02.2014 | AL | 13.01.2021 | AT | 13.01.2021 | CZ | 13.01.2021 | MC | 13.01.2021 | MK | 13.01.2021 | RO | 13.01.2021 | RS | 13.01.2021 | SI | 13.01.2021 | SK | 13.01.2021 | SM | 13.01.2021 | LU | 03.02.2021 | CH | 28.02.2021 | LI | 28.02.2021 | BG | 13.04.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/33] | HU | 03.02.2014 | |
AL | 13.01.2021 | ||
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
LU | 03.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | BG | 13.04.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US320670 (.) [I] 1-15 * columns 1,2 * * figures 1,3 *; | [I]US2722907 (DYER HARRY B) [I] 1-15 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 62 * * figures 1-3 *; | [XI]US3300187 (LUDVIG SAXE, et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 52 * * figures 1-6 * [I] 14; | [A]US4055137 (MOTAI YOICHI, et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, lines 5-16,23-31,63 - column 4, lines 7,47-53 * * column 4, lines 32-39,47-54 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,10 *; | [A]EP2428442 (PRESIGN HOLDING B V [NL]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0035] , [0037] , [0038]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]KR20120091816 (MIRAE IND CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0016] , [0017] , [0033] , [0034] , [0036] , [0040] , [0043] ** figures 1-4 * |