EP3505757 - MICROPUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensile Medical AG Solothurnerstrasse 235 4600 Olten / CH | [2019/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WYSS, Thomas Oberfeldstrasse 4 4528 Zuchwil / CH | 02 /
PERRIER, Alexandre Oristalstrasse 24C 4410 Liestal / CH | 03 /
HUBER, Christian Frikartweg 9 3006 Bern / CH | 04 /
MÜLLER, Matthias Reiserstrasse 178 4600 Olten / CH | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | reuteler & cie SA Chemin de la Vuarpillière 29 1260 Nyon / CH | [2019/27] | Application number, filing date | 17210840.9 | 28.12.2017 | [2019/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3505757 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F04B7/04, F04B9/04, F04B19/00 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
F04B19/006 (EP,KR,US);
F04B13/00 (US);
F04B19/22 (US);
F04B43/043 (US);
F04B7/04 (EP,KR);
F04B7/06 (US);
F04B9/042 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROPUMPE | [2019/27] | English: | MICROPUMP | [2019/27] | French: | MICROPOMPE | [2019/27] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 30.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006056828 (NAVARRO THIERRY [CH]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [AD]EP1677859 (ECOLE POLYTECH [CH]) [AD] 1-13 * figure 3a; claims 1-17 *; | [AD]EP1803934 (SENSILE MEDICAL A G [CH]) [AD] 1-13 * figure 1a; claims 1-13 *; | [A]EP2962714 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1 * figure 3; claim 1 * | by applicant | EP1677859 | EP1803934 |