EP3505231 - MIXER, MULTI-COMPONENT DISPENSER, AND METHOD OF DISPENSING MULTI-COMPONENT MATERIAL FROM A MULTI-COMPONENT DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sulzer Mixpac AG Rütistrasse 7 9469 Haag (Rheintal) / CH | [2019/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schoeck, Joachim Gebhartstrasse 3 8404 Winterthur / CH | [2019/27] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2019/27] | Application number, filing date | 17211041.3 | 29.12.2017 | [2019/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3505231 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01F5/00, B01F5/06, B01F13/00 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
B01F25/12 (EP);
B05B7/0408 (US);
B01F25/432 (US);
B01F25/4321 (EP);
B01F33/50112 (EP,US);
B05C17/00553 (EP);
B01F2101/2305 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MISCHER, MEHRKOMPONENTENAUSGABEGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSGABE VON MEHRKOMPONENTENMATERIAL AUS EINEM MEHRKOMPONENTENAUSGABEGERÄT | [2019/27] | English: | MIXER, MULTI-COMPONENT DISPENSER, AND METHOD OF DISPENSING MULTI-COMPONENT MATERIAL FROM A MULTI-COMPONENT DISPENSER | [2019/27] | French: | MÉLANGEUR, DISTRIBUTEUR À COMPOSANTS MULTIPLES ET PROCÉDÉ DE DISTRIBUTION DE MATÉRIAU À COMPOSANTS MULTIPLES À PARTIR D'UN DISTRIBUTEUR À COMPOSANTS MULTIPLES | [2019/27] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 29.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE29912888U (PRESTELE EUGEN [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,10,12-16 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 1, paragraph 5 * * page 2, paragraph 12 - page 3, paragraph 3 * * figure - * [A] 3,7,8,11; | [XA]WO2005095225 (5 MIX LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-6,9-16 * page 1, line 3 - line 7 * * page 2, line 1 - line 21 * * page 3, line 13 - line 21 * * page 3, line 36 - line 38 * * page 4, line 20 - line 32 * * page 12, line 1 - line 36 * * page 15, line 26 - page 16, line 5 * * page 16, line 29 - page 21, line 12 * * figure - * [A] 7,8; | [XA]EP1731216 (LEMUTH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6,9-16 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] * * figure - * [A] 7,8; | [XA]US2016030899 (WORTHY JUDE ALEXANDER GLYNN [GB], et al) [X] 1-9,11,12,14 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0083] * * figure - *[A] 10,13,15,16 |