EP3473972 - DART GAME SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/17] | DART GAME APPARATUS AND DART GAME SYSTEM | ||
[2021/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phoenixdarts Co., Ltd. 306, 111 Digital-ro 26-gil Guro-gu (Guro-dong, JNK Digital Tower) Seoul / KR | [2020/16] |
Former [2020/12] | For all designated states Phoenixdarts Co., Ltd. 306, 111 Digital-ro 26-gil Guro-gu (Guru-dong, JNK Digital Tower) Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2020/09] | For all designated states Phoenixdarts Co., Ltd. 306, 111 Digital-ro 26-gil Guro-gu Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2019/49] | For all designated states Hong International Corp. 306 111 Digital-ro 26-gil Guro-gu Seoul 08390 / KR | ||
Former [2019/17] | For all designated states Hong International Corp. No. 306, 111 Digital-ro 26gil Guro-gu Seoul 08390 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HONG, Sang Uk 1701, 19 Yeongdong-daero 142-gil Gangnam-gu Seoul 06075 / KR | [2022/18] |
Former [2019/49] | 01 /
HONG, Sang Uk 1701, 19 Yeongdong-daero 142-gil Gangnam-gu Seoul 06075 / KR | ||
Former [2019/17] | 01 /
HONG, Sang Uk 1701, 19 Yeongdong-daero 142-gil 06075 Gangnam-gu Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Rondano, Davide, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | [2022/18] |
Former [2019/17] | Concone, Emanuele, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 17211088.4 | 29.12.2017 | [2019/17] | Priority number, date | KR20170134891 | 17.10.2017 Original published format: KR 20170134891 | [2019/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3473972 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3473972 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F41J3/00, F41J3/02 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
F41J3/0009 (EP,KR);
A63F13/71 (KR);
A63F13/837 (KR);
A63F9/02 (KR);
F41J3/02 (EP,KR);
G07F17/32 (KR);
A63F2009/2457 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] |
Former [2019/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PFEILWURFSPIELSYSTEM | [2021/49] | English: | DART GAME SYSTEM | [2021/49] | French: | SYSTÈME DE JEU DE FLÉCHETTES | [2021/49] |
Former [2019/17] | PFEILWURFSPIELVORRICHTUNG UND PFEILWURFSPIELSYSTEM | ||
Former [2019/17] | DART GAME APPARATUS AND DART GAME SYSTEM | ||
Former [2019/17] | APPAREIL DE JEU DE FLÉCHETTES ET SYSTÈME DE JEU DE FLÉCHETTES | Examination procedure | 24.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2019 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 24.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.12.2017 | AL | 04.05.2022 | CY | 04.05.2022 | CZ | 04.05.2022 | DK | 04.05.2022 | EE | 04.05.2022 | FI | 04.05.2022 | HR | 04.05.2022 | IT | 04.05.2022 | LT | 04.05.2022 | LV | 04.05.2022 | MC | 04.05.2022 | MK | 04.05.2022 | MT | 04.05.2022 | NL | 04.05.2022 | RO | 04.05.2022 | RS | 04.05.2022 | SE | 04.05.2022 | SI | 04.05.2022 | SK | 04.05.2022 | SM | 04.05.2022 | TR | 04.05.2022 | BG | 04.08.2022 | NO | 04.08.2022 | GR | 05.08.2022 | IS | 04.09.2022 | IE | 29.12.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 29.12.2017 | |
AL | 04.05.2022 | ||
CY | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
MK | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
TR | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
IE | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 29.12.2017 | |
AL | 04.05.2022 | ||
CY | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MK | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
IE | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 29.12.2017 | |
AL | 04.05.2022 | ||
CY | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
IE | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 29.12.2017 | |
AL | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
IE | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
IE | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
IE | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 04.05.2022 | |
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | DK | 04.05.2022 | |
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | FI | 04.05.2022 | |
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 04.05.2022 | |
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 04.05.2022 | |
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | FI | 04.05.2022 | |
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 04.05.2022 | |
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2009225879 (ARUZE CORP) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0026] - [0033] - [0038] , [0042] , [0045] , [0046]; figures 1,2,3,4,9 *; | [Y]KR20130123984 (KIM CHANG HEE [KR], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0034] - [0036] - [0043] , [0044] , [0049] - [0057] - [0069]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP2918315 (SEGA GAMES DOING BUSINESS AS SEGA GAMES CO LTD KK [JP], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0020] - [0028] - [0030] , [0032] - [0038] - [0043] - [0056] - [0068] , [0073] , [0084]; figures 1-7 *; | [YA]KR20160084713 (HONG INT CORP [KR]) [Y] 5-15 * paragraphs [0025] , [0059] - [0068]; figures 2,4 *[A] 1-4,16-20; | [Y]KR20170021279 (HONG INT CORP [KR]) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0024] - [0029] - [0032] - [0045] - [0047] , [0061] , [0062] , [0065] , [0066] , [0076] , [0077] , [0082] , [0097] , [0098]; figures 1,2 * | Examination | KR101749696B | by applicant | KR101032367B | KR101032368B |