EP3477493 - MACHINE LEARNING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Secondmind Limited 72 Hills Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 1LA / GB | [2020/51] |
Former [2019/18] | For all designated states Prowler.io Limited 3rd Floor, Charter House 66-68 Hills Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 1LA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAU-MOYA, Jordi c/o Prowler.io Limited 3rd Floor, Charter House 66-68 Hills Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 1LA / GB | 02 /
LEIBFRIED, Felix c/o Prowler.io Limited 3rd Floor, Charter House 66-68 Hills Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 1LA / GB | 03 /
BOU-AMMAR, Haitham c/o Prowler.io Limited 3rd Floor, Charter House 66-68 Hills Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 1LA / GB | [2019/18] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/18] | EIP EIP Europe LLP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17275175.2 | 27.10.2017 | [2019/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3477493 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/11, A63F13/55, G06N99/00 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
G06N3/006 (EP);
G06N3/08 (US);
G06N3/045 (EP,US);
G06N3/047 (US);
G06N3/084 (EP);
G06N7/01 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] |
Former [2019/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MASCHINENLERNSYSTEM | [2019/18] | English: | MACHINE LEARNING SYSTEM | [2019/18] | French: | SYSTÈME D'APPRENTISSAGE PAR MACHINE | [2019/18] | Examination procedure | 01.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 04.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.05.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005245303 (GRAEPEL KURT H [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I] - Felix Leibfried ET AL, "An Information-Theoretic Optimality Principle for Deep Reinforcement Learning", (20170806), Cornell University Library, URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1708.01867v1.pdf, (20180423), XP055469442 [I] 1-15 * pages 2 and 5 * | [I] - GRAU-MOYA JORDI ET AL, Planning with Information-Processing Constraints and Model Uncertainty in Markov Decision Processes, ECCV 2016 CONFERENCE; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE; LECT.NOTES COMPUTER], SPRINGER INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHING, CHAM, PAGE(S) 475 - 491, (20160904), ISSN 0302-9743, ISBN 978-3-319-69952-3, XP047355579 [I] 1-15 * section 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-319-46227-1_30 | [A] - FRENAY B ET AL, "QL"2, a simple reinforcement learning scheme for two-player zero-sum Markov games", NEUROCOMPUTING, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 72, no. 7-9, doi:10.1016/J.NEUCOM.2008.12.022, ISSN 0925-2312, (200903), pages 1494 - 1507, (20090112), XP025976321 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neucom.2008.12.022 | [A] - CHEN WENLIN ET AL, "A unifying learning framework for building artificial game-playing agents", ANNALS OF MATHEMATICS AND ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE, BALTZER, BASEL, CH, vol. 73, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S10472-015-9450-1, ISSN 1012-2443, (20150131), pages 335 - 358, (20150131), XP035485308 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10472-015-9450-1 | [T] - JORDI GRAU-MOYA ET AL, "Non-Equilibrium Relations for Bounded Rational Decision-Making in Changing Environments", ENTROPY, (20171221), vol. 20, no. 1, doi:10.3390/e20010001, page 1, XP055468122 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/e20010001 | [T] - Jordi Grau-Moya ET AL, "Balancing Two-Player Stochastic Games with Soft Q-Learning", (20180209), Cornell University Library, URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1802.03216.pdf, (20180423), XP055469677 [T] * the whole document * |