EP3358242 - LIGHTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M.I.H. 255 Boulevard de la Madeleine 060000 Nice / FR | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERMIGLIO, Yves 98 Allée Pierre Maissa 06700 SAINT LAURENT DU VAR / FR | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Decobert, Jean-Pascal Hautier IP 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/32] | Decobert, Jean-Pascal Cabinet Hautier Office Méditerranéen de Brevets d'Invention 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | Application number, filing date | 17305123.6 | 03.02.2017 | [2018/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3358242 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F21K9/272, // F21Y115/10 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
F21K9/272 (EP);
A01K63/06 (EP);
F21V17/002 (EP);
F21V27/00 (EP);
F21Y2115/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/32] | English: | LIGHTING DEVICE | [2018/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2018/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/28] | 22.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2007242466 (WU CHEN-HO [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10-12,14,15 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0037]; figures 3-4B * [A] 9 [Y] 4-8 [I] 13; | [A]US2008031005 (LIAO MING-HONG [TW]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]JP2011070985 (IDEC CORP) [Y] 4-8 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0050]; figures 8-9 *; | [Y]JP2012133928 (SHARP KK) [Y] 4-8 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0060]; figure 6 *; | [X]DE102012019734 (NARVA LICHTQUELLEN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,12-14 * the whole document *; | [XAY]WO2017006192 (KRISHNA RAVI [IN]) [X] 1-3,10,11,13-15 * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0063]; figures 3A-3F * [A] 9 [Y] 4-8 |