EP3383043 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR PICTURE ENCODING AND DECODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2019 [2019/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2018/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POIRIER, Tangi c/o Technicolor R&D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné Cedex / FR | 02 /
GALPIN, Franck c/o Technicolor R&D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné Cedex / FR | 03 /
LELEANNEC, Fabrice c/o Technicolor R&D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné Cedex / FR | [2018/40] | Representative(s) | Huchet, Anne, et al InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 20, rue Rouget de Lisle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/40] | Huchet, Anne, et al InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 1 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 17305347.1 | 27.03.2017 | [2018/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3383043 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/176, H04N19/70, H04N19/119, H04N19/167 | [2018/40] | CPC: |
H04N19/70 (EP);
H04N19/119 (EP,US);
H04N19/167 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BILDCODIERUNG UND -DECODIERUNG | [2018/40] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR PICTURE ENCODING AND DECODING | [2018/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL DE CODAGE ET DE DÉCODAGE D'IMAGE | [2018/40] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/36] | 18.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP3059708 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]WO2016209757 (CISCO TECH INC [US]); |