EP3415273 - DEVICE FOR ADHESIVELY BLOCKING A SEMI-FINISHED OPTICAL ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Essilor International 147, rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PINAULT, Sébastien C/o ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147 rue de Paris 94220 CHARENTON LE PONT / FR | 02 /
MARTIN, Luc C/o ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147 rue de Paris 94220 CHARENTON LE PONT / FR | 03 /
MOINE, Jérôme C/o ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147 rue de Paris 94220 CHARENTON LE PONT / FR | 04 /
BULTEZ, Xavier C/o ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147 rue de Paris 94220 CHARENTON LE PONT / FR | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2024/04] |
Former [2018/51] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs-Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 17305708.4 | 12.06.2017 | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3415273 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3415273 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B24B13/005 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
B24B13/005 (EP,US);
B24B9/146 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/28] |
Former [2018/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ADHÄSIVEN BLOCKIERUNG EINES HALBFERTIGEN OPTISCHEN ELEMENTS | [2018/51] | English: | DEVICE FOR ADHESIVELY BLOCKING A SEMI-FINISHED OPTICAL ELEMENT | [2018/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BLOCAGE PAR ADHÉRENCE D'UN ÉLÉMENT OPTIQUE SEMI-FINI | [2018/51] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/28] | 04.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2582087 (TURNER JOHN R, et al) [Y] 1,4-6,10,14 * Coil 22 * * Adhesive;; claims 4, 5 *; | [Y]WO9841359 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 1,14* abstract *; | [Y]US2002061717 (GOULET MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 2,13 * paragraph [0025]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]JP2002192447 (CANON KK) [Y] 1,14 * paragraphs [0016] , [ 0018] * * Adhesive 52; paragraphs [0021] - [0065] *; | [Y]JP2003071691 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [Y] 1,9,14 * Positioning; paragraphs [0025] - [0030] * * Adhesive;; claims 1-4 *; | [Y]EP2011604 (SATISLOH AG [CH]) [Y] 4-6,10 * paragraph [0068] *; | [Y]JP2010137316 (OLYMPUS CORP) [Y] 1,9,14 * Positioning means; paragraphs [0013] , [ 0021]; figures 9, 10, 14-16 * * Adhesive;; claims 1-4 *; | [Y]EP2498950 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [Y] 1,2,14 * paragraphs [0019] , [ 0020] , [ 0043] , [ 0055] * * paragraphs [0066] , [ 0067]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0009] , [ 0015] , [ 0038] * * Adhesive; paragraphs [0045] - [0054] - [ 0074] - [0078] *; | [XDYI]JP2013180373 (HOYA CORP) [XD] 12 * figures 1-8; claim 1 * * paragraphs [0020] , [ 0021] , [ 0029] - [0031] - [ 0037] * * paragraphs [0058] , [ 0064] , [ 0077] , [ 0087] , [ 0095] * [Y] 2,4-6,9,10,13 [I] 1,3,7,8,11; | [Y]US2015306722 (FELTEN YOHANN [FR]) [Y] 1,2,9,14 * paragraphs [0027] , [ 0060] , [ 0071] , [ 0080] * * paragraphs [0096] , [ 0103] , [ 0104] * * Positioning means; paragraph [0054] * * Adhesive, claim 1;; claim 1 * | Examination | EP2498950 | - MICHAL BRIAN T. ET AL, "Stimuli-Responsive Reversible Two-Level Adhesion from a Structurally Dynamic Shape-Memory Polymer", APPLIED MATERIALS & INTERFACES, US, vol. 8, no. 17, doi:10.1021/acsami.6b01251, ISSN 1944-8244, (20160420), pages 11041 - 11049, URL: https://pubs.acs.org/doi/pdf/10.1021/acsami.6b01251, XP093062825 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acsami.6b01251 | - EISENHAURE JEFFREY D ET AL, "The Use of Shape Memory Polymers for MEMS Assembly", JOURNAL OF MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEMS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, US, vol. 25, no. 1, doi:10.1109/JMEMS.2015.2482361, ISSN 1057-7157, (20160201), pages 69 - 77, (20160201), XP011597841 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JMEMS.2015.2482361 | by applicant | JP2013180373 |