EP3260887 - METHODS AND DATA PROCESSING APPARATUS FOR SEISMIC SIGNAL SEPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CGG Services SAS 27, Avenue Carnot 91300 Massy / FR | [2017/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POOLE, Gordon C/O CGG SERVICES SAS 27, avenue Carnot 91300 MASSY / FR | 02 /
TEYSSANDIER, Benoît co/ CGG SERVICES SAS 27, Avenue Carnot 91300 Massy / FR | [2017/52] | Representative(s) | Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/52] | Petit, Maxime Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | Application number, filing date | 17305761.3 | 21.06.2017 | [2017/52] | Priority number, date | US201662353614P | 23.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662353614 P | [2017/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3260887 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/00, // G01V1/37 | [2017/52] | CPC: |
G01V1/005 (EP,US);
G01V1/36 (US);
G01V1/32 (US);
G01V1/38 (US);
G01V1/375 (EP,US);
G01V2210/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] |
Former [2017/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND DATENVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR TRENNUNG SEISMISCHER SIGNALE | [2017/52] | English: | METHODS AND DATA PROCESSING APPARATUS FOR SEISMIC SIGNAL SEPARATION | [2017/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES POUR LA SÉPARATION DE SIGNAUX SISMIQUES | [2017/52] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/23] | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009116337 (CHIU STEPHEN K [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0040] , [0 44] - [0047] - [0 50] - [0052] *; | [XI]US2012314536 (BAGAINI CLAUDIO [NO]) [X] 1-4,6-9,11-14 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 19] , [0 22] - [0023] - [0 25] , [0 28] - [0043] * [I] 5,10,15; | [A]US8724428 (SALLAS JOHN [US]) [A] 1-15* column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 25 *; | [X]US2014269173 (COSTE EMMANUEL [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0007] , [0 24] - [0025] - [0 42] - [0044] *; | [X] - CLAUDIO BAGAINI, "Acquisition and processing of simultaneous vibroseis data", vol. 58, no. 1, doi:10.1111/J.1365-2478.2009.00842.X, ISSN 0016-8025, (20100101), pages 81 - 99, GEOPHYSICAL PROSPECTING, BLACKWELL SCIENCE, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/10.1111/j.1365-2478.2009.00842.x/pdf, (20091106), XP002694674 [X] 1,11 * page 84, column 2 - page 85, column 1 * * page 86, column 2 - page 87, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/J.1365-2478.2009.00842.X | by applicant | US8837259 |