EP3392341 - PROCESS FOR SHORTENING THE HYDROCARBON CHAIN OF A CARBOXYLIC ACID BY A PEROXYGENASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consejo Superior de Investigaciones Científicas (CSIC) Avda. María Luisa S/N Pabellón de Perú 41013 Sevilla / ES | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUTIÉRREZ SUÁREZ, Ana INSTITUTO DE RECURSOS NATURALES Y AGROBIOLOGIA SEVILLA (IRNAS), Materiales Lignocelulósicos de Interés Industrial Avda. Reina Mercedes, 10 41012 SEVILLA / ES | 02 /
OLMEDO MENA-BERNAL, Andrés INSTITUTO DE RECURSOS NATURALES Y AGROBIOLOGIA SEVILLA (IRNAS), Materiales Lignocelulósicos de Interés Industrial Avda. Reina Mercedes, 10 41012 SEVILLA / ES | 03 /
DEL RÍO ANDRADE, José Carlos INSTITUTO DE RECURSOS NATURALES Y AGROBIOLOGIA SEVILLA (IRNAS), Materiales Lignocelulósicos de Interés Industrial Avda. Reina Mercedes, 10 41012 SEVILLA / ES | 04 /
MARTÍNEZ FERRER, Ángel Tomás CENTRO DE INVESTIGACIONES BIOLOGICAS (CIB) Biotecnología para biomasa lignocelulósica Ramiro de Maeztu, 9 28040 MADRID / ES | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Pons Glorieta Rubén Darío 4 28010 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2018/43] | Pons Glorieta Ruben Dario 4 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 17382211.5 | 20.04.2017 | [2018/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3392341 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3392341 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/64, C12P7/44, C12P7/40 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
C12P7/40 (EP);
C12P7/44 (EP);
C12P7/6409 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] |
Former [2018/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERKÜRZUNG DER KOHLENWASSERSTOFFKETTE EINER CARBONSÄURE DURCH EINE PEROXYGENASE | [2018/43] | English: | PROCESS FOR SHORTENING THE HYDROCARBON CHAIN OF A CARBOXYLIC ACID BY A PEROXYGENASE | [2018/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR RACCOURCIR LA CHAÎNE HYDROCARBURE D'UN ACIDE CARBOXYLIQUE PAR UNE PEROXYGÉNASE | [2018/43] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/22] | 17.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.04.2017 | AL | 10.03.2021 | AT | 10.03.2021 | CY | 10.03.2021 | CZ | 10.03.2021 | EE | 10.03.2021 | FI | 10.03.2021 | HR | 10.03.2021 | IT | 10.03.2021 | LT | 10.03.2021 | LV | 10.03.2021 | MC | 10.03.2021 | MK | 10.03.2021 | MT | 10.03.2021 | NL | 10.03.2021 | PL | 10.03.2021 | RO | 10.03.2021 | RS | 10.03.2021 | SE | 10.03.2021 | SI | 10.03.2021 | SK | 10.03.2021 | SM | 10.03.2021 | IE | 20.04.2021 | LU | 20.04.2021 | BE | 30.04.2021 | CH | 30.04.2021 | LI | 30.04.2021 | BG | 10.06.2021 | GB | 10.06.2021 | NO | 10.06.2021 | GR | 11.06.2021 | IS | 10.07.2021 | PT | 12.07.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 20.04.2017 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
MK | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 20.04.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
GB | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 20.04.2017 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 20.04.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
GB | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 20.04.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
GB | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 20.04.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
GB | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 20.04.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
GB | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 20.04.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
GB | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 20.04.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
LU | 20.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2016207373 (NOVOZYMES AS [DK]) [X] 1-8 * pages 38-39; example 6 * * pages 35-36; example 1 *; | [A] - JANSEN G A ET AL, "Alpha-Oxidation", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA. MOLECULAR CELL RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 1763, no. 12, ISSN 0167-4889, (20061201), pages 1403 - 1412, (20061201), XP027896775 [A] 1-15 * page 1410, paragraph 4.1. * * figure 1 * | [AD] - VEERLE FOULON ET AL, "Breakdown of 2-Hydroxylated Straight Chain Fatty Acids via Peroxisomal 2-Hydroxyphytanoyl-CoA Lyase : A REVISED PATHWAY FOR THE [alpha]-OXIDATION OF STRAIGHT CHAIN FATTY ACIDS", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20050318), vol. 280, no. 11, doi:10.1074/jbc.M413362200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 9802 - 9812, XP055415742 [AD] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M413362200 | [A] - HAMBERG M ET AL, "alpha-oxidation of fatty acids in higher plants. Identification of a pathogen-inducible oxygenase (piox) as an alpha-dioxygenase and biosynthesis of 2-hydroperoxylinolenic acid.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19990827), vol. 274, no. 35, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 24503 - 24513, XP055415804 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - ANDRÉS OLMEDO ET AL, "From Alkanes to Carboxylic Acids: Terminal Oxygenation by a Fungal Peroxygenase", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (20160830), vol. 55, no. 40, doi:10.1002/anie.201605430, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 12248 - 12251, XP055415744 [A] 2 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201605430 | [A] - WANG YONGHUA ET AL, "Peroxygenases en route to becoming dream catalysts. What are the opportunities and challenges?", CURRENT OPINION IN CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (20161216), vol. 37, doi:10.1016/J.CBPA.2016.10.007, ISSN 1367-5931, pages 1 - 9, XP029988258 [A] 1-15 * Paragraph "Alkane hydroxylation"; page 2 - page 5; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cbpa.2016.10.007 | by applicant | WO2008119780 | - M. HOFRICHTER ET AL., ADV. EXP. MED. BIOL., (2015), vol. 851, pages 341 - 368 | - M. HOFRICHTER ET AL., APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2010), vol. 87, pages 871 - 897 | - A. GUTIERREZ ET AL., ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (2011), vol. 514, pages 33 - 43 | - PETER, M. ET AL., FEBS J., (2011), vol. 278, pages 3667 - 3675 | - D. FLOUDAS ET AL., SCIENCE, (2012), vol. 336, pages 1715 - 1719 | - G. GROBE ET AL., AMB EXPRESS, (2011), vol. 1, pages 31 - 42 | - A. OLMEDO ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2016), vol. 55, pages 12248 - 12251 | - V. FOULON ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2005), vol. 280, pages 9802 - 9812 | - G. A. JANSEN ET AL., BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA (BBA) - MOLECULAR CELL RESEARCH, (2006), vol. 1763, pages 1403 - 1412 | - H. ZHANG ET AL., IND. ENG. CHEM. RES., (2013), vol. 52, pages 18458 - 18465 | - GROBE, G.; ULLRICH, M.; PECYNA, M.; KAPTURSKA, D.; FRIEDRICH, S.; HOFRICHTER, M.; SCHEIBNER, K., "High-yield production of aromatic peroxygenase by the agaric fungus Marasmius rotula", AMB EXPRESS, (2011), vol. 1, pages 31 - 42 | - HIGGINS, CABIOS, (1989), vol. 5, pages 151 - 153 | - WILBUR; LIPMAN, PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE USA, (1983), vol. 80, pages 726 - 730 | - DEVEREUX ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1984), vol. 12, page 287 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1999), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - G. GROBE, M. ULLRICH; M. PECYNA; D. KAPTURSKA; S. FRIEDRICH; M. HOFRICHTER; K. SCHEIBNER, "High-yield production of aromatic peroxygenase by the agaric fungus Marasmius rotula", AMB EXPRESS, (2011), vol. 1, pages 31 - 42 | - R. ULLRICH; J. NUSKE; K. SCHEIBNER; J. SPANTZEL; M. HOFRICHTER, APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (2004), vol. 70, pages 4575 - 4581 | - V. FOULON; M. SNIEKERS; E. HUYSMANS; S. ASSELBERGHS; V. MAHIEU; G. P. MANNAERTS; P. P. VAN VELDHOVEN; M. CASTEELS, J. BIOL. CHEM., (2005), vol. 280, pages 9802 - 9812 | - G. A. JANSEN; R. J. A. WANDERS, BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA (BBA) - MOLECULAR CELL RESEARCH, (2006), vol. 1763, pages 1403 - 1412 |