EP3402044 - MAGNET MODULE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.03.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Renewable Technologies Wind B.V. Bergschot 69/2 4817 PA Breda / NL | [2018/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bueno de Santiago, Adrian C. Sardenya, 48 Escalera B, 5º-1º 08005 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
Urresty, Julio César C. Londres, 12, esc. A, 4º 1ª 08029 Barcelona / ES | [2018/46] | Representative(s) | de Rooij, Mathieu Julien, et al Bardehle Pagenberg S.L. Avenida Diagonal 598, 3° 1ª 08021 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2018/46] | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor 08002 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 17382260.2 | 10.05.2017 | [2018/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3402044 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/27, H02K1/28 | [2018/46] | CPC: |
H02K1/278 (EP,US);
H02K1/2766 (EP);
H02K1/2791 (EP,US);
H02K1/28 (EP);
H02K2213/03 (EP);
H02K2213/12 (EP);
H02K7/1838 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/25] |
Former [2018/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PERMANENTMAGNETMODULE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN PRODUZIEREN | [2018/46] | English: | MAGNET MODULE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME | [2018/46] | French: | MODULE À AIMANTS PERMANENTS ET MÉTHODE DE FABRICATION SEMBLABLE | [2018/46] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/25] | 14.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102004031329 (KLINGER FRIEDRICH [DE]) [X] 1,2,13-15 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0049]; figures 3-7 *; | [A]US2007090708 (TAKAHASHI MASAKATSU [JP], et al) [A] 1-15; | [XY]WO2007063370 (HIGH TECHNOLOGY INVESTMENTS B [NL], et al) [X] 1,6,13-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0012]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 7; | [A]EP2506400 (CONVERTEAM TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB])[A] 1-15; | [X]WO2013145684 (TOSHIBA MITSUBISHI ELEC INC [JP]) [X] 1,3-5,13-15 * abstract *; | [X]US2013270954 (ERD LUDWIG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-5,8,13-15 * paragraph [0045]; figures 2,3,6 *; | [Y]EP2658095 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 8-12 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]EP2712060 (ALSTOM WIND SLU [ES]) [Y] 7 * abstract *; | [XY]US2016218574 (MUNDHAS MARCEL [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,13-15 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1-6 * [Y] 8-12 |