EP3200103 - A CENTRALIZED CONTENT MANAGEMENT SYSTEM WITH AN INTELLIGENT METADATA LAYER, AND A METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M-Files Oy Hermiankatu 1 33720 Tampere / FI | [2017/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIVALA, Antti Isomäenkuja 3 J 33950 PIRKKALA / FI | 02 /
MILLIKEN, Gregory 3904 Bowhill Dr. AUSTIN, TX Texas 78731-3806 / US | 03 /
RANTANEN, Mikko Mäkitie 9 33610 TAMPERE / FI | 04 /
MÄNTYSALO, Jyri Toivolankuja 3 33820 TAMPERE / FI | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2021/23] |
Former [2017/31] | Berggren Oy, Tampere Visiokatu 1 33720 Tampere / FI | Application number, filing date | 17397503.8 | 24.01.2017 | [2017/31] | Priority number, date | US201615010244 | 29.01.2016 Original published format: US201615010244 | [2017/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3200103 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3200103 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/27, G06F16/901 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
G06F16/27 (EP,US);
G06F16/211 (US);
G06F16/282 (US);
G06F16/9024 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/31] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/09] |
Former [2017/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZENTRALISIERTES INHALTSVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM MIT EINER INTELLIGENTEN METADATENSCHICHT UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2017/31] | English: | A CENTRALIZED CONTENT MANAGEMENT SYSTEM WITH AN INTELLIGENT METADATA LAYER, AND A METHOD THEREOF | [2017/31] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE CONTENU CENTRALISÉ AYANT UNE COUCHE DE MÉTADONNÉES INTELLIGENTE ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2017/31] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/09] | 10.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2019 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 07.02.2019 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 05.06.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.06.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.01.2017 | AL | 09.06.2021 | AT | 09.06.2021 | CY | 09.06.2021 | CZ | 09.06.2021 | DK | 09.06.2021 | EE | 09.06.2021 | ES | 09.06.2021 | FI | 09.06.2021 | HR | 09.06.2021 | IT | 09.06.2021 | LT | 09.06.2021 | LV | 09.06.2021 | MC | 09.06.2021 | MK | 09.06.2021 | NL | 09.06.2021 | PL | 09.06.2021 | RO | 09.06.2021 | RS | 09.06.2021 | SE | 09.06.2021 | SI | 09.06.2021 | SK | 09.06.2021 | SM | 09.06.2021 | BG | 09.09.2021 | NO | 09.09.2021 | GR | 10.09.2021 | IS | 09.10.2021 | PT | 11.10.2021 | IE | 24.01.2022 | LU | 24.01.2022 | BE | 31.01.2022 | CH | 31.01.2022 | LI | 31.01.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 24.01.2017 | |
AL | 09.06.2021 | ||
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CY | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
IE | 24.01.2022 | ||
LU | 24.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 24.01.2017 | |
AL | 09.06.2021 | ||
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
IE | 24.01.2022 | ||
LU | 24.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
IE | 24.01.2022 | ||
LU | 24.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
LU | 24.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
LU | 24.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
LU | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
MC | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
IT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SI | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
AT | 09.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
DK | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
EE | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
PL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
IS | 09.10.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RO | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SK | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
CZ | 09.06.2021 | ||
ES | 09.06.2021 | ||
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 09.06.2021 | |
FI | 09.06.2021 | ||
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
NL | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
SM | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
RS | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
HR | 09.06.2021 | ||
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
LV | 09.06.2021 | ||
SE | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
NO | 09.09.2021 | ||
GR | 10.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
LT | 09.06.2021 | ||
BG | 09.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 09.06.2021 | |
LT | 09.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007078897 (HAYASHI NATHANAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-11,16,18 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0100] *; | [XI] - M-Files Enterprise Information Management, "Webinar: Got a Data/Content Disconnect?", (20150924), page 1, URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=j3YprnIjCdA, (20170410), XP054977256 [X] 1-5,9-11,16,18 * 14:55 * * 20:34 * * 24:23-25:04 * * 28:10 * * 32:04 * * 32:24 * * 32:54 * * 45:55-46:27 * [I] 6-8,12-15,17,19 | [XI] - M-Files Enterprise Information Management, "Webinar: How's SharePoint working for you?", (20151117), page 1, URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=nECc03psT2s, (20170410), XP054977255 [X] 1-5,9-11,16,18 * 25:09 * * 55:20 * [I] 6-8,12-15,17,19 | [XP] - Anonymous, "The Intelligent Metadata Layer: A Repository Agnostic Approach to ECM", (20161231), pages 1 - 8, URL: https://www.m-files.com/Content/documents/en/res/whitepapers/The-Intelligent-Metadata-Layer-White-Paper.pdf, (20170407), XP055362994 [XP] 1-11,16,18 * the whole document * | [A] - Todd Kitta ET AL, "The SharePoint 2010 Platform", SharePoint Server 2010 Enterprise Content Management, Indianapolis, IN, USA, Wrox, (20110906), pages 17 - 30, ISBN 978-0-470-58465-1, XP055362156 [A] 1-11,16,18 * the whole document * | [A] - Anonymous, "M-FILES 2015.1 NEW FEATURES AND ENHANCEMENTS", (20150924), pages 1 - 33, URL: https://kb.cloudvault.m-files.com/#3ECA226F-7B54-428B-B539-DE443E6134EC, (20170407), XP055363013 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * |