EP3399889 - PROMOTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ERD EASY B.V. Verlengde Spoorlaan 40 3904 MB Veenendaal / NL | [2018/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUIJTS, Hendrikus Dorothëus p/a Verlengde Spoorlaan 40 3904 MB Veenendaal / NL | 02 /
FERNANDES DINIS, Pedro Miguel p/a Verlengde Spoorlaan 40 3904 MB Veenendaal / NL | [2018/46] | Representative(s) | van Essen, Peter Augustinus Van Essen Patent B.V. Lange Amerikaweg 81 7332 BP Apeldoorn / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2018/46] | van Essen, Peter Augustinus Van Essen Patent B.V. Agro Business Park 50 6708 PW Wageningen / NL | Application number, filing date | 17700138.5 | 06.01.2017 | [2018/46] | WO2017EP50282 | Priority number, date | NL20162016076 | 08.01.2016 Original published format: NL 2016076 | NL20162016457 | 18.03.2016 Original published format: NL 2016457 | [2018/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017118743 | Date: | 13.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3399889 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A47F5/00, A47F5/08 | [2018/46] | CPC: |
A47F5/0869 (EP,US);
A47F5/0853 (US);
A47F5/0006 (US);
A47F5/0823 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/46] | Title | German: | PROMOTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/46] | English: | PROMOTION DEVICE | [2018/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROMOTION | [2018/46] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/46] | 02.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/23] | 04.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO9310516 (HL DISPLAY AB [SE]) [Y] 1,2,8 * page 4, line 19 - page 6, line 1 * * figure - * [A] 3-7,9-13; | [YA]US6128843 (GEBKA JOHN [US]) [Y] 1-3 * column 4, line 64 - column 6, line 53 * * column 8, line 1 - line 13 * * figure - * [A] 4-13; | [YA]DE20012583U (NIKA UHREN UND SCHMUCKVERTRIEB [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4-13; | [YA]DE202006017549U (LUX GMBH & CO KG EMIL [DE]) [Y] 1,2,8 * the whole document *[A] 3-7,9-13 |