EP3414473 - SHIFT ACTUATOR FOR CARRYING OUT A GEAR SELECTION OF A MANUAL TRANSMISSION FOR A VEHICLE, MANUAL TRANSMISSION SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE, DRIVE TRAIN FOR A VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR INSTALLING A SHIFT ACTUATOR FOR A MANUAL TRANSMISSION OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Löwentaler Strasse 20 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPRATTE, Joachim Hermann-Moormann-Str. 29 49090 Osnabrueck / DE | 02 /
FORTMANN, Wolfgang Johann-Hinrich-Wichern-Str. 9 49163 Bohmte / DE | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | ZF Friedrichshafen AG Gewerblicher Rechtsschutz Löwentalerstraße 20 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 17700166.6 | 09.01.2017 | [2018/51] | WO2017EP50298 | Priority number, date | DE201610202188 | 12.02.2016 Original published format: DE102016202188 | [2018/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017137188 | Date: | 17.08.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3414473 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/32, F16H61/36 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
F16H61/32 (EP,US);
F16H1/28 (US);
F16H59/041 (US);
F16H59/044 (US);
F16H61/22 (US);
F16H61/36 (EP,US);
F16H2061/2838 (EP,US);
F16H2061/2853 (EP,US);
F16H2061/2869 (EP,US);
F16H2061/2892 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Title | German: | SCHALTAKTOR ZUM AUSFÜHREN EINER GANGWAHL EINES SCHALTGETRIEBES FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG, SCHALTGETRIEBESYSTEM FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG, ANTRIEBSSTRANG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERBAUEN EINES SCHALTAKTORS FÜR EIN SCHALTGETRIEBE EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2018/51] | English: | SHIFT ACTUATOR FOR CARRYING OUT A GEAR SELECTION OF A MANUAL TRANSMISSION FOR A VEHICLE, MANUAL TRANSMISSION SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE, DRIVE TRAIN FOR A VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR INSTALLING A SHIFT ACTUATOR FOR A MANUAL TRANSMISSION OF A VEHICLE | [2018/51] | French: | ACTIONNEUR DE CHANGEMENT DE VITESSE PERMETTANT D'EFFECTUER UNE SÉLECTION D'UN RAPPORT D'UNE BOÎTE DE VITESSES D'UN VÉHICULE, SYSTÈME DE BOÎTE DE VITESSES D'UN VÉHICULE, CHAÎNE CINÉMATIQUE D'UN VÉHICULE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE D'UN ACTIONNEUR DE CHANGEMENT DE VITESSE D'UNE BOÎTE DE VITESSES D'UN VÉHICULE | [2018/51] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 11.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/35] | 23.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE19635867 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,6,7,9,12,14 * abstract * * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 33 * [A] 2; | [XYI]EP1106877 (SILA HOLDING IND SRL [IT]) [X] 1,6,8-11,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0016] - [0023] - [0031] * [Y] 2,3 [I] 12,14; | [XYI]WO03029040 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE], et al) [X] 1,6,8,9,11,12,14 * abstract * [Y] 2,3 [I] 10,15; | [Y]US2003221499 (WONG YONG Q [US]) [Y] 2,3 * abstract ** paragraphs [0025] - [0029] *; | [XI]WO2005057051 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,9 * figures 1,2 * [I] 3,8,12,13 |