EP3565731 - A METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR DETERMINING THE STATE OF CHARGE OF A BATTERY PACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Truck Corporation 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2019/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GELSO, Esteban Björkhöjdsgatan 25 426 51 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
BRYNGELSSON, Hanna Vävlagaregatan 3C 416 58 Göteborg / SE | [2019/46] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 2096 403 12 Göteborg / SE | [2019/46] | Application number, filing date | 17700267.2 | 09.01.2017 | [2019/46] | WO2017EP50338 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018127296 | Date: | 12.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3565731 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3565731 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60L3/12, G01R31/36, G01R31/3842 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
B60L3/12 (EP,KR,US);
B60L58/12 (KR);
G01R31/31912 (US);
G01R31/367 (US);
G01R31/3835 (US);
G01R31/3842 (EP,KR);
G01R31/388 (US);
B60L2200/18 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2200/22 (KR);
B60L2200/36 (KR);
B60L2200/40 (KR);
B60L2240/545 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2240/547 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2260/44 (EP,KR,US);
B60Y2200/11 (KR);
B60Y2200/14 (KR);
B60Y2200/41 (KR);
B60Y2200/91 (KR);
Y02T10/70 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/46] | B60L3/12, B60L11/18, G01R31/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND KONFIGURATION ZUR LADEZUSTANDSBESTIMMUNG EINES BATTERIEPACKS | [2022/24] | English: | A METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR DETERMINING THE STATE OF CHARGE OF A BATTERY PACK | [2019/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET CONFIGURATION DE DÉTERMINATION DE L'ÉTAT DE CHARGE D'UN BLOC-BATTERIE | [2022/24] |
Former [2019/46] | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM BESTIMMEN DES LADEZUSTANDES EINES BATTERIEPACKS | ||
Former [2019/46] | PROCÉDÉ ET AGENCEMENT DE DÉTERMINATION DE L'ÉTAT DE CHARGE D'UN BLOC-BATTERIE | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/46] | 02.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.06.2023
26.06.2023
ADMISSIBLE Scania CV AB 151 87 Södertälje / SE Opponent's representative Thum, Bernhard Thum & Partner Thum Mötsch Weickert Patentanwälte PartG mbB Siebertstr. 6 81675 München / DE | [2023/31] | 02.08.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.12.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.10.2022 | AT | 19.10.2022 | CZ | 19.10.2022 | DK | 19.10.2022 | EE | 19.10.2022 | ES | 19.10.2022 | FI | 19.10.2022 | HR | 19.10.2022 | IT | 19.10.2022 | LT | 19.10.2022 | LV | 19.10.2022 | MC | 19.10.2022 | PL | 19.10.2022 | RO | 19.10.2022 | RS | 19.10.2022 | SE | 19.10.2022 | SI | 19.10.2022 | SK | 19.10.2022 | SM | 19.10.2022 | IE | 09.01.2023 | LU | 09.01.2023 | GB | 19.01.2023 | NO | 19.01.2023 | GR | 20.01.2023 | BE | 31.01.2023 | CH | 31.01.2023 | LI | 31.01.2023 | IS | 19.02.2023 | PT | 20.02.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
IT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
IE | 09.01.2023 | ||
LU | 09.01.2023 | ||
GB | 19.01.2023 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
IE | 09.01.2023 | ||
LU | 09.01.2023 | ||
GB | 19.01.2023 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SI | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.01.2023 | ||
GB | 19.01.2023 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.01.2023 | ||
GB | 19.01.2023 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.01.2023 | ||
GB | 19.01.2023 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.01.2023 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SK | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 19.10.2022 | |
AT | 19.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
CZ | 19.10.2022 | ||
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RO | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
EE | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
DK | 19.10.2022 | ||
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
SM | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
PL | 19.10.2022 | ||
RS | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
IS | 19.02.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
HR | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
LV | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
GR | 20.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 19.10.2022 | |
ES | 19.10.2022 | ||
FI | 19.10.2022 | ||
LT | 19.10.2022 | ||
SE | 19.10.2022 | ||
NO | 19.01.2023 | ||
PT | 20.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 19.10.2022 | |
NO | 19.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2014316728 (ZHONG QISHUI [CN], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0105] *; | [I]EP2816366 (VITO NV VLAAMSE INSTELLING VOOR TECHNOLOGISCH ONDERZOEK NV [BE]) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0057] *; | [A]DE102015108294 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract ** page 3 - page 10 *; | [XI]WO2016059126 (JAGUAR LAND ROVER LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,5-12 * abstract * * page 5 - page 11 * [I] 3,4 | Examination | US2012041698 | US2014244225 | by applicant | US2015046108 | Opposition | US5349540 | EP1873542 | US2011031938 | US2011148424 | US2012041698 | US2013300377 | US2014244225 | CN104076293 | US2014316728 | US2014333317 | EP2816366 | EP2848952 | CN104569835 | US2015219726 | US2015251556 | US2015251555 | DE102015108294 | WO2015188610 | WO2016059126 | WO2016083753 | WO2016083758 | CN105974320 | US2017098021 | US2017356964 | - P. Spagnol ; S. Rossi ; S. M. Savaresi, "Kalman Filter SoC estimation for Li-Ion batteries", Control Applications (CCA), 2011 IEEE International Conference on, IEEE, (20110928), doi:10.1109/CCA.2011.6044480, ISBN 978-1-4577-1062-9, pages 587 - 592, XP031976024 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CCA.2011.6044480 |