EP3568333 - ELECTROMECHANICAL MOTOR VEHICLE POWER STEERING MECHANISM FOR ASSISTING STEERING OF A MOTOR VEHICLE WITH SAFETY LIMITS FOR TORQUE REQUEST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states thyssenkrupp Presta AG Essanestrasse 10 9492 Eschen / LI | For all designated states thyssenkrupp AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2020/17] |
Former [2019/47] | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Presta AG Essanestrasse 10 9492 Eschen / LI | ||
For all designated states thyssenkrupp AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VARGA, Adám Rétköz utca 67 1118 Budapest / HU | 02 /
KAKAS, Péter Frankhegy utca 1. 1/2 1118 Budapest / HU | [2021/11] |
Former [2019/47] | 01 /
VARGA, Adám Rétköz utca 67 1118 Budapest / HU | ||
02 /
KAKAS, Péter Frankhegy utca 1118 Budapest / HU | Representative(s) | thyssenkrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2019/47] | Application number, filing date | 17700657.4 | 13.01.2017 | [2019/47] | WO2017EP50677 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018130297 | Date: | 19.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3568333 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3568333 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
B62D5/0463 (EP,US);
B62D5/0484 (US);
B62D5/0409 (US);
B62D5/0481 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMECHANISCHER KRAFTFAHRZEUGSERVOLENKMECHANISMUS ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DER LENKUNG EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS MIT SICHERHEITSBEGRENZUNGEN ZUR DREHMOMENTANFORDERUNG | [2019/47] | English: | ELECTROMECHANICAL MOTOR VEHICLE POWER STEERING MECHANISM FOR ASSISTING STEERING OF A MOTOR VEHICLE WITH SAFETY LIMITS FOR TORQUE REQUEST | [2019/47] | French: | MÉCANISME DE DIRECTION ASSISTÉE DE VÉHICULE À MOTEUR ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE POUR ASSISTER LA DIRECTION D'UN VÉHICULE À MOTEUR AVEC DES LIMITES DE SÉCURITÉ POUR LA DEMANDE DE COUPLE | [2019/47] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/47] | 13.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.01.2017 | AL | 28.04.2021 | AT | 28.04.2021 | CY | 28.04.2021 | DK | 28.04.2021 | EE | 28.04.2021 | FI | 28.04.2021 | HR | 28.04.2021 | LT | 28.04.2021 | LV | 28.04.2021 | MC | 28.04.2021 | MK | 28.04.2021 | NL | 28.04.2021 | PL | 28.04.2021 | RO | 28.04.2021 | RS | 28.04.2021 | SE | 28.04.2021 | SI | 28.04.2021 | SK | 28.04.2021 | SM | 28.04.2021 | TR | 28.04.2021 | BG | 28.07.2021 | NO | 28.07.2021 | GR | 29.07.2021 | IS | 28.08.2021 | PT | 30.08.2021 | IE | 13.01.2022 | LU | 13.01.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/24] | HU | 13.01.2017 | |
AL | 28.04.2021 | ||
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
MK | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IE | 13.01.2022 | ||
LU | 13.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
MK | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IE | 13.01.2022 | ||
LU | 13.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IE | 13.01.2022 | ||
LU | 13.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IE | 13.01.2022 | ||
LU | 13.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
LU | 13.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
DK | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
PL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SE | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2004005112 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE], et al) [Y] 3-5,9,10,17-19 * page 8, line 25 - line 30 *; | [A]DE102009048092 (THYSSENKRUPP PRESTA AG [LI]) [A] 1,15 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056]; figure 5 *; | [XYI]WO2012037995 (THYSSENKRUPP PRESTA AG [LI], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,14-16 * page 7, line 14 - page 11, line 15; figures 2,3 * [Y] 3-5,9,10,17-19 [I] 11-13; | [A]DE102014116235 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT AUTOMOTIVE STEERING [DE]) [A] 1,15* paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0028]; figure 2 * |