EP3571076 - A PREDICTIVE SCENT CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Vahrenwalder Straße 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2022/31] |
Former [2019/48] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Straße 9 30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERNANDES, Brian Sunil Nicholas BLK 577 Woodlands Drive 16 04-572 Singapore 730577 / SG | 02 /
JABLONSKI, Thomas Hemauerstrasse 25 93047 Regensburg / DE | [2019/48] | Representative(s) | Continental Corporation c/o Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Intellectual Property Guerickestraße 7 60488 Frankfurt a. Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/48] | Lee, Jun-Hoe Daniel Continental Teves AG & Co. OHG Intellectual Property Guerickestraße 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 17700824.0 | 19.01.2017 | [2019/48] | WO2017EP51016 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018133933 | Date: | 26.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3571076 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60H3/00, A61L9/12, B60R25/104, B60H1/00 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
B60H3/0007 (EP);
B60H3/0035 (US);
A61L9/14 (EP,US);
B60H1/00742 (EP,US);
B60H1/008 (EP,US);
B60H1/00971 (EP,US);
B60R25/01 (EP);
B60R25/018 (EP,US);
A61L2209/111 (EP,US);
B60H2003/0064 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/48] | Title | German: | PRÄDIKTIVES GERUCHSKONTROLLSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2019/48] | English: | A PREDICTIVE SCENT CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD THEREOF | [2019/48] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE PARFUM PRÉDICTIF ET SON PROCÉDÉ | [2019/48] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/48] | 19.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/21] | 19.01.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH06227248 (NIPPON DENSO CO) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]JP2000060949 (CALSONIC CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2008006651 (ARAKAWA TOSHIYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0074]; figure - * | by applicant | EP0483848 | US2012107172 | GB2521929 |