EP3405732 - NEW TYPE OF HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2021 [2021/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SGL Carbon SE Söhnleinstrasse 8 65201 Wiesbaden / DE | [2018/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRIST, Martin Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 18 86405 Meitingen / DE | 02 /
RASHIDI, Arash Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 18 86405 Meitingen / DE | 03 /
HUDLER, Bastian Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 18 86405 Meitingen / DE | 04 /
KUCHER, Martin Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 18 86405 Meitingen / DE | 05 /
BALDERMANN, Klaus Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 18 86405 Meitingen / DE | 06 /
KOECK, Thomas Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 18 86405 Meitingen / DE | [2018/48] | Application number, filing date | 17700833.1 | 19.01.2017 | [2018/48] | WO2017EP51077 | Priority number, date | DE20162000316U | 20.01.2016 Original published format: DE 202016000316 U | [2018/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017125490 | Date: | 27.07.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3405732 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F28D9/00, F28F21/02 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
F28D21/0003 (EP);
F28D9/0062 (EP);
F28F21/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/48] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGER WAERMEUEBERTRAGER | [2018/48] | English: | NEW TYPE OF HEAT EXCHANGER | [2018/48] | French: | NOUVEL ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR | [2018/48] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/48] | 20.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/03] | 15.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3231015 (KOCH PAUL H) [X] 1,3,4 * column 1 - column 8; figure 4 *; | [X]US3363681 (REVILOCK JOSEPH F, et al) [X] 1 * figures 8, 9; claims 1-4 *; | [X]DE2406522 (SIGRI ELEKTROGRAPHIT GMBH) [X] 1,3,4,6,7 * figure 1; claims 1-2 *; | [A]JPS57155087 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 2* abstract *; | [A]US5628363 (DEWAR DOUGLAS M [US], et al) [A] 2 * figure 3; claim 1 *; | [XI]WO0031485 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [I] 8-10 |