EP3414862 - PILOT DESIGN FOR UPLINK (UL) NARROW-BAND INTERNET OF THINGS (NB-IOT) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAKOORIAN, Seyed Ali Akbar 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
GAAL, Peter 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
RICO ALVARINO, Alberto 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
WANG, Xiaofeng 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
CHEN, Wanshi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 06 /
WANG, Renqiu 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 07 /
XU, Hao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/51] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17701615.1 | 05.01.2017 | [2018/51] | WO2017US12370 | Priority number, date | US201662292830P | 08.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662292830 P | US201662309331P | 16.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662309331 P | US201662312452P | 23.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662312452 P | US201715397934 | 04.01.2017 Original published format: US201715397934 | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017139047 | Date: | 17.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3414862 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04L27/26, H04W4/00, H04B7/06, H04L25/02 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
H04W4/70 (EP,US);
H04L27/2613 (EP,US);
H04L5/0051 (EP,US);
H04L5/0064 (EP,US);
H04W72/542 (US);
H04B7/0684 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Title | German: | PILOTDESIGN FÜR UPLINK (UL) SCHMALBANDIGES INTERNET DER DINGE (NB-IOT) | [2018/51] | English: | PILOT DESIGN FOR UPLINK (UL) NARROW-BAND INTERNET OF THINGS (NB-IOT) | [2018/51] | French: | CONCEPTION DE PILOTE POUR L'INTERNET DES OBJETS DE BANDE ÉTROITE (NB-IOT) DE LIAISON MONTANTE (UL) | [2018/51] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 06.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2665221 (IND TECH RES INST [TW]); | [A]US2014376356 (PARK JONGHYUN [KR], et al); | [A]US2015236883 (YOON SUNG JUN [KR]); |