EP3405393 - CATALYTIC INERTING SYSTEM FOR AN AIRCRAFT WITH MULTIPLE FUEL TANKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parker-Hannifin Corporation 6035 Parkland Boulevard Cleveland, OH 44124 / US | [2023/22] |
Former [2018/48] | For all designated states Parker-Hannifin Corporation 6035 Parkland Boulevard Cleveland, OH 44124 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENSEN, Bryan, David 25081 Portsmouth Mission Viejo CA 92692 / US | 02 /
HAYDEN, John, William 20 Highfield Glen Irvine CA 92618 / US | [2018/48] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/22] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2018/48] | Atkinson, Ian Anthony Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Euston House 24 Eversholt Street London NW1 1AD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17702257.1 | 19.01.2017 | [2018/48] | WO2017US14023 | Priority number, date | US201662281757P | 22.01.2016 Original published format: US 201662281757 P | [2018/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017127478 | Date: | 27.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3405393 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3405393 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B64D37/32 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
B64D37/32 (EP,RU,US);
B01D53/265 (US);
B01D53/8671 (US);
B01D2257/104 (US);
B01D2259/4575 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATALYTISCHES INERTISIERUNGSSYSTEM FÈR EIN FLUGZEUG MIT MEHREREN TREIBSTOFFTANKS | [2022/43] | English: | CATALYTIC INERTING SYSTEM FOR AN AIRCRAFT WITH MULTIPLE FUEL TANKS | [2018/48] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MISE SOUS ATMOSPHÈRE INERTE POUR AVION À PLUSIEURS RÉSERVOIRS DE CARBURANT | [2022/43] |
Former [2018/48] | KATALYTISCHES INERTISIERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EIN FLUGZEUG MIT MEHREREN TREIBSTOFFTANKS | ||
Former [2018/48] | SYSTÈME D'INERTAGE CATALYTIQUE DESTINÉ À UN AÉRONEF DOTÉ DE MULTIPLES RÉSERVOIRS DE CARBURANT | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/48] | 25.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.09.2022 | 27.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.05.2023 | CZ | 31.05.2023 | DK | 31.05.2023 | EE | 31.05.2023 | FI | 31.05.2023 | HR | 31.05.2023 | IT | 31.05.2023 | LT | 31.05.2023 | LV | 31.05.2023 | MC | 31.05.2023 | NL | 31.05.2023 | PL | 31.05.2023 | RO | 31.05.2023 | RS | 31.05.2023 | SE | 31.05.2023 | SI | 31.05.2023 | SK | 31.05.2023 | SM | 31.05.2023 | NO | 31.08.2023 | GR | 01.09.2023 | IS | 30.09.2023 | PT | 02.10.2023 | LU | 19.01.2024 | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/40] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
IT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
MC | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
IT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB653667 (ROLLS ROYCE) [Y] 9 * page 3, lines 47-75; figure - *; | [Y]US3732668 (NICHOLS R) [Y] 14 * abstract *; | [A]EP1591359 (AIRBUS UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1-25* abstract *; | [XYI]WO2011117610 (AIRBUS OPERATIONS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 5-8,19,20,24 * page 7, lines 2-18 * * page 8, lines 15-24; figure - * [Y] 1-4,9,12,14,23,25 [I] 21,22; | [Y]US2012193479 (ROSCOE PAUL [FR], et al) [Y] 1-4,9,12,14,23,25 * paragraphs [0044] - [0048]; figure 3 * |