EP3400009 - COMBINATION OF HISTONE DEACETYLASE INHIBITOR AND IMMUNOTHERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The USA, as represented by The Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services Office of Technology Transfer National Institutes of Health 6701 Rockledge Drive, Suite 700 MSC 7788 Bethesda, MD 20892-7788 / US | [2023/24] |
Former [2019/17] | For all designated states The USA, as represented by The Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services Office of Technology Transfer National Institutes of Health 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 MSC 7660 Bethesda, MD 20892-7660 / US | ||
Former [2018/51] | For all designated states The USA, as represented by The Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services 6011 Executive Blvd, Ste. 325 Msc 7660 Nih/Od/Oir/Ott Bethesda, MD 20892 / US | ||
Former [2018/46] | For all designated states The U.S.A. as represented by the Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services Office of Technology Transfer National Institutes of Health 6001 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 MSC 7660 Bethesda, MD 20892-7660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HODGE, James, W. 11128 Dewey Road Kensington, MD 20895 / US | 02 /
GAMEIRO, Sofia, R. National Cancer Institute/Center for Cancer Research Laboratory of Tumor Immunology and Biology 10 Center Drive, room 5B46 Bethesda, MD 20892-1750 / US | [2018/46] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/46] | Huenges, Martin Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17702441.1 | 04.01.2017 | [2018/46] | WO2017US12149 | Priority number, date | US201662274946P | 05.01.2016 Original published format: US 201662274946 P | US201662278852P | 14.01.2016 Original published format: US 201662278852 P | [2018/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017120204 | Date: | 13.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3400009 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K45/06, A61K31/19, C07K16/28, A61P35/00 | [2018/46] | CPC: |
A61K31/4406 (EP,US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/4166 (EP,US);
A61K31/58 (EP,US);
A61K39/001102 (EP,US);
A61K39/001152 (EP,US);
A61K39/001182 (EP,US);
A61K39/001194 (EP,US);
A61K39/235 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/167, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4166, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4406, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/58, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/46] | Title | German: | KOMBINATION VON HISTONDEACETYLASEHEMMER UND IMMUNTHERAPIE | [2018/46] | English: | COMBINATION OF HISTONE DEACETYLASE INHIBITOR AND IMMUNOTHERAPY | [2018/46] | French: | COMBINAISON D'UN INHIBITEUR D'HISTONE DÉSACÉTYLASE ET D'UNE IMMUNOTHÉRAPIE | [2018/46] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/46] | 04.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 31.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/36] | 30.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO2015035112 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]); | [XPYI]WO2016153839 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al); | [XPYI]WO2016154068 (SYNDAX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]); | [E]WO2017004092 (SYNDAX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]); | by applicant | US4235871 | US4501728 | US4536516 | US4547773 | US4837028 | US5019369 | US5698530 | US6001349 | US6045802 | US6165460 | US6319496 | US6548068 | WO2005046622 | WO2005046614 | US6946133 | US6969609 | US7211432 | US7247615 | US7368116 | US7410644 | US7598225 | US7662395 | US7771715 | US7871986 | US7999071 | US8178508 | US8188214 | WO2012103658 | US2013315941 | US8609395 | US8613933 | WO2014043518 | WO2014043535 | WO2015061415 |