EP3406112 - METHODS FOR PROCESSING A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2018/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Timothy Michael 12 Suburban Drive Elmira, New York 14903 / US | 02 /
SOPER, Joseph William 8985 County Rt. 52 Arkport, New York 14807 / US | 03 /
STEWART, Ross Johnson 719 1/2 Hopkins Street Elmira, New York 14904 / US | 04 /
WEBER, Gary Carl 2855 Westinghouse Rd. Horeseheads, New York 14845 / US | [2018/48] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/48] | Scheuermann, Erik Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 17703280.2 | 19.01.2017 | [2018/48] | WO2017US14042 | Priority number, date | US201662281302P | 21.01.2016 Original published format: US 201662281302 P | [2018/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017127489 | Date: | 27.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3406112 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/03, H05K3/00 | [2018/48] | CPC: |
H05K3/007 (EP);
B32B43/006 (EP,KR);
B32B17/06 (EP,KR);
B32B7/06 (EP,KR);
G02F1/133305 (EP);
H01L21/6835 (EP);
H05K1/0306 (EP);
B32B2457/20 (EP,KR);
G02F1/1303 (EP);
H01L2221/6835 (EP);
H01L2221/68381 (EP);
H05K2203/0264 (EP);
H05K2203/085 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINES SUBSTRATS | [2018/48] | English: | METHODS FOR PROCESSING A SUBSTRATE | [2018/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT D'UN SUBSTRAT | [2018/48] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/48] | 16.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/52] | 24.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2015059987 (KUMAKURA KAYO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,16 * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] - [0061] - [0080] - [0138] - [0142] - [0240] - [0243]; figure - * [I] 4-6,9-15,17; | [XI]US2015151531 (OHNO MASAKATSU [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,7,8,16 * paragraphs [0006] - [0009] - [0045] - [0048] - [0054] , [0079] , [0080] , [0086] - [0095]; figure - * [I] 2,4-6,9-15,17; | [XAI]EP2398040 (BREWER SCIENCE INC [US]) [X] 1,3,14,15 * paragraphs [0004] - [0009] - [0027] - [0029] - [0036] , [0062] - [0074]; figure - * [A] 2 [I] 4,6-13,16,17; | [XAI]US2014295642 (FOURNEL FRANK [FR], et al) [X] 1,3,6-8,16,17 * paragraphs [0030] , [0042] , [0061] , [0066] - [0071]; figure - * [A] 2,5,14,15 [I] 4,9-13; | [A]US2012135187 (TAKIMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0087]; figure - *; | [A]US2012223049 (YOSHIKAWA MINORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0052]; figure - * | by applicant | US2014170378 | US2015329415 | WO2015113020 | WO2015113023 | WO2015112958 | WO2015157202 | EP2025650 | KR20130044774 |