EP3402848 - HYDROXY FUNCTIONAL ALKYL POLYUREA CROSSLINKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.09.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG Industries Ohio, Inc. 3800 West 143rd Street Cleveland, OH 44111 / US | [2018/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SWARUP, Shanti 4918 Meadow Crest Drive Allison Park PA 15101 / US | 02 /
ZHOU, Hongying 3953 North Monet Court Allison Park PA 15101 / US | 03 /
CHASSER, Anthony, M. 1409 Fernledge Drive Allison Park PA 15101 / US | 04 /
MILLERO, JR., Edward, R. 3138 Seneca Court Gibsonia PA 15044 / US | 05 /
KURTZ, Christopher, P. 445 Marzolf Road Millvale PA 15209 / US | 06 /
DUDIK, John, M. 426 Karpaw Lane Apollo PA 15613 / US | 07 /
XU, Xiangling 106 Woodshire Road Pittsburgh PA 15215 / US | 08 /
RETSCH, JR., William, H. 4369 Winchester Drive Allison Park PA 15101 / US | 09 /
CHAO, Tien-Chieh 2011 Buckingham Drive Mars PA 16046 / US | 10 /
KABAGAMBE, Benjamin 350 Woodbridge Drive Pittsburgh PA 15237 / US | 11 /
KRALIC, Ronald 977 Mercer Road Beaver Falls PA 15010 / US | [2018/47] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2018/47] | Application number, filing date | 17704345.2 | 13.01.2017 | [2018/47] | WO2017US13454 | Priority number, date | US201614996838 | 15.01.2016 Original published format: US201614996838 | [2018/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017123955 | Date: | 20.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3402848 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/02, C09D5/03, C09D175/02, C08G18/32, C08L75/02, B27N3/00 | [2018/47] | CPC: |
C09D175/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07C275/14 (CN,KR,US);
B05D7/14 (CN,KR);
B27N3/002 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
B27N7/005 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B65D1/12 (CN,KR,US);
C07C275/26 (CN,KR,US);
C08G18/22 (CN,KR);
C08G18/246 (EP,CN,US);
C08G18/3271 (CN,KR);
C08G18/3275 (EP,CN,RU,US);
C08G18/348 (EP,CN,US);
C08G18/48 (CN,US);
C08G18/4854 (EP,CN,US);
C08G18/6692 (EP,CN,US);
C08G18/672 (EP,CN,US);
C08G18/73 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08G18/751 (CN,KR,US);
C08G18/755 (EP,CN,US);
C08G18/792 (EP,CN,US);
C08G18/8041 (EP,CN,US);
C08J7/04 (CN,KR);
C08K5/0016 (CN,KR);
C08K5/21 (CN,KR);
C08L75/02 (CN,RU);
C08L75/14 (CN,KR);
C09D175/02 (CN,KR,RU,US);
C09D175/16 (EP,CN,US);
C09D5/02 (EP,CN,US);
C09D5/03 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C09D7/63 (CN,KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/672, C08G18/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/47] | Title | German: | HYDROXYFUNKTIONELLE ALKYK-POLYHARNSTOFF-VERNETZER | [2018/47] | English: | HYDROXY FUNCTIONAL ALKYL POLYUREA CROSSLINKERS | [2018/47] | French: | AGENTS DE RÉTICULATION ALKYL POLYURÉE À FONCTIONNALITÉ HYDROXYLE | [2018/47] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/47] | 30.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]JPH11335594 ; | [X]JP2001192609 ; | [A]US4211683 (DIETERICH DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-23* examples 1-3,5,7 *; | [X]US4990579 (PAAR WILLIBALD [AT]) [X] 1,3-9,11,12,15-18,20,23 * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 6; claims 1-10 * * column 2, lines 12-45 *; | [X]US5047294 (SCHWAB MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1-9,11,12,15-18,20,23 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 34; examples 1-7; claims 1,3-6,8,11,13,14 * * column 5, lines 6-19,44-59 * * column 6, lines 21-68 * * column 2, lines 5-37 *; | [X]EP0519186 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 4-13,15-20,23 * page 6, lines 7-18; examples 7,10; claims 1,5,6; table III *; | [X]EP0866082 (BASF CORP [US]) [X] 1-12,15-23 * page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 5; claims 1-7 * * page 7, line 37 - page 16, line 46 * * page 6, line 45 *; | [X]EP2316868 (CYTEC SURFACE SPECIALTIES AT [AT]) [X] 1-8,11,12,15-20,22,23 * paragraphs [0005] , [0016] , [0023] , [0036] , [0037] , [0053] , [0055]; examples 1-4,14 *; | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 09, Database accession no. 2000-101050, XP002770004 & JPH11335594 A 19991207 (SANYO CHEM IND LTD) [X] 1-8,11-21,23 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0013] - [0016] , [0019] , [0027] , [0029] , [0030] , [0051]; claims 1-12 * [I] 9,10 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 03, Database accession no. 2002-020457, XP002770005 & JP2001192609 A 20010717 (SANYO CHEM IND LTD) [X] 1-8,11-21,23 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] , [0030] , [0034] , [0046] , [0060] , [0063]; examples 2,3 * | by applicant | US5714539 | US6875800 | US6894086 | US7605194 | US8153344 | WO2013191825 | US2016280951 |