EP3416980 - NOVEL PEPTIDES AND COMBINATION OF PEPTIDES FOR USE IN IMMUNOTHERAPY AGAINST NHL AND OTHER CANCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immatics Biotechnologies GmbH Paul-Ehrlich-Strasse 15 72076 Tübingen / DE | [2018/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOOR, Oliver Eichhaldenstrasse 19 72074 Tübingen / DE | 02 /
MAHR, Andrea Kirschenweg 22 72076 Tübingen / DE | 03 /
WEINSCHENK, Toni Im Morgenrain 15 73773 Aichwald / DE | 04 /
WIEBE, Anita Quellenstrasse 49 72124 Ruebgarten / DE | 05 /
FRITSCHE, Jens Lärchenweg 11 72144 Dusslingen / DE | 06 /
SINGH, Harpreet Heckscherstrasse 25a 80804 Münich / DE | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/52] | Krauss, Jan Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17705891.4 | 17.02.2017 | [2018/52] | WO2017EP53704 | Priority number, date | GB20160002918 | 19.02.2016 Original published format: GB 201602918 | US201662297495P | 19.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662297495 P | [2018/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017140897 | Date: | 24.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3416980 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
C07K14/4748 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/0011 (EP,US);
A61K39/001114 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/4644 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP,KR);
C07K14/705 (US);
C07K14/7051 (KR,US);
C07K14/70539 (KR,US);
C07K16/30 (KR,US);
C12N15/115 (KR,US);
C12N5/0638 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/6886 (KR,US);
G01N33/57492 (KR,US);
A61K2039/5158 (KR);
C07K2319/33 (KR,US);
C12N2310/16 (KR,US);
C12N2501/50 (KR,US);
C12Q2600/106 (KR,US);
C12Q2600/156 (KR,US);
C12Q2600/158 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] | Extension states | BA | 03.08.2018 | ME | 03.08.2018 | Validation states | MA | 03.08.2018 | MD | 03.08.2018 | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE PEPTIDE UND KOMBINATION AUS PEPTIDEN ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER IMMUNTHERAPIE GEGEN NHL UND ANDERE KARZINOME | [2018/52] | English: | NOVEL PEPTIDES AND COMBINATION OF PEPTIDES FOR USE IN IMMUNOTHERAPY AGAINST NHL AND OTHER CANCERS | [2018/52] | French: | NOUVEAUX PEPTIDES ET COMBINAISON DE PEPTIDES POUR UNE UTILISATION DANS L'IMMUNOTHÉRAPIE CONTRE LE LYMPHOME NON HODGKINIEN ET D'AUTRES CANCERS | [2018/52] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 03.08.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2019/50] | 06.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/04] | 22.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/04] | Divisional application(s) | EP21165092.4 / EP3885356 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0157273 (MOLECULAR DYNAMICS INC [US], et al); | [X]EP1589100 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP]); | [X]US2008039413 (MORRIS DAVID W [US], et al); | [X]WO2011037827 (BATTELLE ENERGY ALLIANCE LLC [US]); | [A]WO2011128448 (IMMATICS BIOTECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]WO2011151403 (IMMATICS BIOTECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]WO2015150327 (BIONTECH CELL & GENE THERAPIES GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]WO2015193359 (IMMATICS BIOTECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]) |