EP3413805 - SUTURE ANCHOR WITH DEFORMABLE CAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2019 | Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smith & Nephew, Inc 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US | [2018/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUNN, Richard M. 65 Stoney Point Drive Kingston, MA 02364 / US | 02 /
YOUNG, Timothy c/o Smith&Nephew Inc. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, Tennessee 38116 / US | [2018/51] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2018/51] | Application number, filing date | 17706113.2 | 10.02.2017 | [2018/51] | WO2017US17370 | Priority number, date | US201662294391P | 12.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662294391 P | [2018/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017139574 | Date: | 17.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3413805 | Date: | 19.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/04 | [2018/51] | CPC: |
A61B17/0401 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (US);
A61B2017/00867 (US);
A61B2017/0403 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0412 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0414 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0424 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0427 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0438 (US);
A61B2017/0445 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NAHTANKER MIT VERFORMBARER KAPPE | [2018/51] | English: | SUTURE ANCHOR WITH DEFORMABLE CAP | [2018/51] | French: | ANCRAGE DE SUTURE AVEC BOUCHON DÉFORMABLE | [2018/51] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/51] | 12.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2015005951 (SMITH & NEPHEW INC [US]) [X] 1-5,7-15 * figures 5A-D * * pages 9-12 * [I] 6,16; | [X]WO2015134872 (SMITH & NEPHEW INC [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1-2B *; | [X]EP1199035 (ETHICON INC [US]) [X] 1 * figure 3 * |