EP3411306 - POUCH ASSEMBLY FOR HOLDING AN AQUEOUS UREA SOLUTION FOR USE IN AN SCR SYSTEM FOR TREATING THE EXHAUST GASES OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE OF A VEHICLE AND SYSTEM FOR TREATING THE EXHAUST GASES OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE OF A VEHICLE USING THE AQUEOUS UREA SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yara International ASA Drammensveien 131 0277 Oslo / NO | [2018/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOONDERBEEK, Jeroen Chemin du Fond Coron 7a 1380 Lasne / BE | 02 /
JØRGENSEN, Sigurd Bestumveien 68b 0283 Oslo / NO | [2018/50] | Representative(s) | De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2018/50] | Application number, filing date | 17706168.6 | 03.02.2017 | [2018/50] | WO2017EP52467 | Priority number, date | EP20160154333 | 04.02.2016 Original published format: EP 16154333 | EP20160154336 | 04.02.2016 Original published format: EP 16154336 | EP20160190446 | 23.09.2016 Original published format: EP 16190446 | [2018/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017134277 | Date: | 10.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3411306 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3411306 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/58 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
B65D75/5883 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B01D53/9418 (US);
F01N13/009 (US);
F01N3/035 (US);
F01N3/0842 (US);
F01N3/2066 (EP,KR,US);
F01N3/2896 (US);
B65D2575/583 (US);
F01N2610/02 (EP,KR,US);
F01N2610/1406 (EP,KR,US);
F01N2610/1413 (EP,KR,US);
F01N2610/142 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEUTELANORDNUNG ZUM ENTHALTEN EINER FLÜSSIGEN HARNSTOFFLÖSUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM SCR-SYSTEM ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ABGASEN EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS EINES FAHRZEUGS SOWIE SYSTEM ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ABGASEN EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS EINES FAHRZEUGS UNTER VERWENDUNG DER FLÜSSIGEN HARNSTOFFLÖSUNG | [2020/46] | English: | POUCH ASSEMBLY FOR HOLDING AN AQUEOUS UREA SOLUTION FOR USE IN AN SCR SYSTEM FOR TREATING THE EXHAUST GASES OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE OF A VEHICLE AND SYSTEM FOR TREATING THE EXHAUST GASES OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE OF A VEHICLE USING THE AQUEOUS UREA SOLUTION | [2018/50] | French: | ENSEMBLE POCHE CONTENANT UNE SOLUTION D'URÉE LIQUIDE DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS UN SYSTÈME DE RÉDUCTION CATALYTIQUE SÉLECTIVE POUR TRAITER LES GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE D'UN VÉHICULE ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DES GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE D'UN VÉHICULE À L'AIDE DE LA SOLUTION D'URÉE LIQUIDE | [2020/46] |
Former [2018/50] | BEUTELANORDNUNG ZUM HALTEN EINER WÄSSRIGEN HARNSTOFFLÖSUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM SCR-SYSTEM ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ABGASEN EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS EINES FAHRZEUGS SOWIE SYSTEM ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ABGASEN EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS EINES FAHRZEUGS UNTER VERWENDUNG DER WÄSSRIGEN HARNSTOFFLÖSUNG | ||
Former [2018/50] | ENSEMBLE POCHE CONÇU POUR CONTENIR UNE SOLUTION D'URÉE AQUEUSE DESTINÉE À ÊTRE UTILISÉE DANS UN SYSTÈME SCR DE TRAITEMENT DES GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE D'UN VÉHICULE ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DES GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE D'UN VÉHICULE UTILISANT LA SOLUTION D'URÉE AQUEUSE | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/50] | 04.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.07.2021 | CY | 14.07.2021 | EE | 14.07.2021 | HR | 14.07.2021 | LT | 14.07.2021 | LV | 14.07.2021 | MC | 14.07.2021 | MK | 14.07.2021 | MT | 14.07.2021 | RS | 14.07.2021 | SI | 14.07.2021 | SM | 14.07.2021 | BG | 14.10.2021 | GR | 15.10.2021 | IS | 14.11.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
MK | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | EE | 14.07.2021 | |
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | EE | 14.07.2021 | |
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/12] | HR | 14.07.2021 | |
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | LT | 14.07.2021 | |
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | LT | 14.07.2021 | |
BG | 14.10.2021 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH11263355 (FUJIMORI KOGYO CO); | [Y]WO0123264 (FUJI SEAL INC [JP], et al); | [A]JP2004131086 (HOSOKAWA YOKO KK, et al); | [Y]US2004112915 (FRANCZYK CATHERINE [US]); | [A]ES2300230 (GRUP VEMSA 1857 S L [ES]); | [A]WO2010006943 (VOLPAK SAU [ES], et al); | [Y]DE102014225119 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR], et al) |