EP3433682 - SAFETY CONTROLLER AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A SAFETY CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WAGO Verwaltungsgesellschaft mbH Hansastrasse 72 32423 Minden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/05] | For all designated states WAGO Verwaltungsgesellschaft mbH Hansastrasse 27 32423 Minden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LASCHINSKY, Maxim Walver Acker 45 32425 Minden / DE | 02 /
VOSS, Christian Birkhuhnweg 17 32427 Minden / DE | [2019/05] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2019/05] | Application number, filing date | 17706176.9 | 14.02.2017 | [2019/05] | WO2017EP53212 | Priority number, date | DE201610204965 | 24.03.2016 Original published format: DE102016204965 | [2019/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017162371 | Date: | 28.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3433682 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3433682 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G05B9/02 | [2019/05] | CPC: |
G05B9/03 (EP,US);
G06F1/06 (US);
G05B19/042 (US);
G06F1/12 (US);
G05B2219/25047 (EP,US);
G06F11/0757 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSSTEUERUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER SICHERHEITSSTEUERUNG | [2019/05] | English: | SAFETY CONTROLLER AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A SAFETY CONTROLLER | [2019/05] | French: | COMMANDE DE SÉCURITÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE COMMANDE DE SÉCURITÉ | [2019/05] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 16.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.02.2017 | AL | 07.04.2021 | CY | 07.04.2021 | CZ | 07.04.2021 | DK | 07.04.2021 | EE | 07.04.2021 | ES | 07.04.2021 | FI | 07.04.2021 | HR | 07.04.2021 | LT | 07.04.2021 | LV | 07.04.2021 | MC | 07.04.2021 | MK | 07.04.2021 | NL | 07.04.2021 | PL | 07.04.2021 | RO | 07.04.2021 | RS | 07.04.2021 | SE | 07.04.2021 | SI | 07.04.2021 | SK | 07.04.2021 | SM | 07.04.2021 | BG | 07.07.2021 | NO | 07.07.2021 | GR | 08.07.2021 | IS | 07.08.2021 | PT | 09.08.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 14.02.2017 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 14.02.2017 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 07.04.2021 | |
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 07.04.2021 | |
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 07.04.2021 | |
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 07.04.2021 | |
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
LT | 07.04.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE10163010 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,7-9 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0036]; figure 1 *[I] 1-12; | [XI]DE102007018468 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,7-9 * the whole document * [I] 1-12 | Examination | DE3225455 |