EP3411347 - MONOCARBONYL RUTHENIUM AND OSMIUM CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Università Degli Studi di Udine Via Palladio, 8 33100 Udine / IT | For all designated states Innovation Factory S.r.l. Localita Padriciano, 99 34149 Trieste / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/50] | For all designated states Universita' Degli Studi di Udine Via Palladio, 8 33100 Udine / IT | ||
For all designated states Innovation Factory S.r.l. Localita Padriciano, 99 34149 Trieste / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARATTA, Walter c/o University of Udine Department of Chemistry Physics and Environmental Via del Cotonificio no 108 33100 Udine / IT | 02 /
BALDINO, Salvatore Via Mosca 37 07100 Sassari / IT | 03 /
GIBOULOT, Steven 5 Boulevard des Felibres 83120 Sainte-Maxime / FR | [2021/13] |
Former [2019/04] | 01 /
BARATTA, Walter c/o University of Udine Department of Chemistry, Physics and Environmental Via del Cotonificio no 108 33100 Udine / IT | ||
02 /
BALDINO, Salvatore Via Mosca 37 07100 Sassari / IT | |||
03 /
GIBOULOT, Steven 5 Boulevard des Felibres 83120 Sainte-Maxime / FR | |||
Former [2018/50] | 01 /
BARATTA, Walter Via Freschi 7/A 33100 Udine / IT | ||
02 /
BALDINO, Salvatore Via Mosca 37 07100 Sassari / IT | |||
03 /
GIBOULOT, Steven 5 Boulevard des Felibres 83120 Sainte-Maxime / FR | Representative(s) | Swift, Jane Elizabeth Berrisford, et al Johnson Matthey Technology Centre Blount's Court Sonning Common Reading RG4 9NH / GB | [2018/50] | Application number, filing date | 17706312.0 | 03.02.2017 | [2018/50] | WO2017IB50598 | Priority number, date | IT2016UB00229 | 05.02.2016 Original published format: IT UB20160229 | [2018/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017134618 | Date: | 10.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3411347 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3411347 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07B41/02, C07F15/00 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
C07B41/02 (EP,GB,US);
C07F15/00 (GB);
B01J31/2452 (US);
B01J31/182 (US);
B01J31/189 (US);
B01J31/2433 (US);
C07C201/12 (EP,US);
C07C29/14 (EP,US);
C07C29/143 (EP,US);
C07C29/145 (EP,US);
C07C41/26 (EP,US);
C07F15/002 (GB);
C07F15/0046 (GB);
C07F15/0053 (EP,US);
B01J2231/641 (US);
B01J2531/0244 (US);
B01J2531/821 (US);
B01J2531/825 (US);
C07C2602/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C201/12, C07C205/19 (US,EP);
C07C29/143, C07C33/22 (US,EP);
C07C29/143, C07C33/24 (US,EP);
C07C29/145, C07C31/125 (US,EP);
C07C29/145, C07C33/20 (EP,US);
C07C29/145, C07C33/22 (EP,US);
C07C29/145, C07C33/26 (US,EP);
C07C29/145, C07C35/36 (EP,US);
C07C29/14, C07C33/22 (US,EP);
C07C29/14, C07C33/30 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MONOCARBONYLRUTHENIUM- UND OSMIUMKATALYSATOREN | [2018/50] | English: | MONOCARBONYL RUTHENIUM AND OSMIUM CATALYSTS | [2018/50] | French: | CATALYSEURS MONOCARBONYLE DE RUTHÉNIUM ET D'OSMIUM | [2018/50] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/50] | 04.09.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.02.2017 | AL | 31.03.2021 | AT | 31.03.2021 | CY | 31.03.2021 | CZ | 31.03.2021 | DK | 31.03.2021 | EE | 31.03.2021 | ES | 31.03.2021 | FI | 31.03.2021 | HR | 31.03.2021 | LT | 31.03.2021 | LV | 31.03.2021 | MC | 31.03.2021 | MK | 31.03.2021 | NL | 31.03.2021 | PL | 31.03.2021 | RO | 31.03.2021 | RS | 31.03.2021 | SE | 31.03.2021 | SI | 31.03.2021 | SK | 31.03.2021 | SM | 31.03.2021 | BG | 30.06.2021 | NO | 30.06.2021 | IS | 31.07.2021 | PT | 02.08.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 03.02.2017 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CY | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 03.02.2017 | |
AL | 31.03.2021 | ||
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
MC | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SI | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
DK | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
ES | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 31.03.2021 | |
AT | 31.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
PL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
IS | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RO | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SK | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
PT | 02.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
CZ | 31.03.2021 | ||
EE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
NL | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 31.03.2021 | |
FI | 31.03.2021 | ||
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LT | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
SM | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
SE | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
LV | 31.03.2021 | ||
RS | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
BG | 30.06.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
HR | 31.03.2021 | ||
NO | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 31.03.2021 | |
NO | 30.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO2005051965 (UNIV DEGLI STUDI UDINE [IT], et al) [XD] 1,7,21-28 * claim 4 *; | [X] - CAVARZAN DEIVIDI ALEXANDRE ET AL, "Neutral and cationic ruthenium carbonyl complexes [Ru(CO)(2,2'-dipyridylamine)(PR3)Cl2] and [Ru(CO)(N-N)(PPh3)2(H)]Cl: synthesis, structural characterization and transfer-hydrogena", TRANSITION METAL CHEMISTRY, CHAPMAN & HALL, GB, vol. 40, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S11243-014-9896-8, ISSN 0340-4285, (20141031), pages 117 - 123, (20141031), XP035432807 [X] 1,2,21-28 * complexes 3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11243-014-9896-8 | [X] - PRASHANT KUMAR ET AL, "Synthesis and characterization of ruthenium(II) complexes based on diphenyl-2-pyridylphosphine and their applications in transfer hydrogenation of ketones", INORGANICA CHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 368, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.ICA.2010.12.057, ISSN 0020-1693, (20101221), pages 124 - 131, (20101230), XP028182335 [X] 1,2,21-28 * complexes 3,6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ica.2010.12.057 | [X] - BARUN BERA ET AL, "Dynamics of H-atom exchange in stable cis-dihydrogen/hydride complexes of ruthenium(ii) bearing phosphine and N-N bidentate ligands", DALTON TRANSACTIONS: THE INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL FOR INORGANIC, ORGANOMETALLIC AND BIOINORGANIC CHEMISTRY, GB, (20140101), vol. 43, no. 12, doi:10.1039/c3dt52575a, ISSN 1477-9226, page 4726, XP055297938 [X] 1,2 * 1b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3dt52575a | [X] - THANGAVEL SATHIYA KAMATCHI ET AL, "Influence of carboxylic acid functionalities in ruthenium (II) polypyridyl complexes on DNA binding, cytotoxicity and antioxidant activity: Synthesis, structure and in vitro anticancer activity", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY., FR, (20130101), vol. 59, doi:10.1016/j.ejmech.2012.11.024, ISSN 0223-5234, pages 253 - 264, XP055297941 [X] 1,2 * complex 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejmech.2012.11.024 | by applicant | WO2005051965 | WO2009007443 | WO2012123761 | - D. A. CAVARZAN ET AL., POLYHEDRON, (2013), vol. 62, page 75 | - S. ZHANG ET AL., ORGANOMETALLICS, (2013), vol. 32, page 5299 | - W. BARATTA ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2004), vol. 43, page 3584 | - W. BARATTA ET AL., ORGANOMETALLICS, (2004), vol. 23, page 6264 |